Turner v. Teknor Apex Company
Plaintiff: Gary S Turner
Defendant: Teknor Apex Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00594
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Mary S McElroy
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Chloe A. Davis on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Davis, Chloe)
December 26, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Teknor Apex Company.(Reeber, Matthew)
December 5, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gary S Turner. Teknor Apex Company served on 12/4/2019, answer due 12/26/2019. (Sinapi, Richard)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Teknor Apex Company. (Potter, Carrie)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
November 15, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1446216 ), filed by Gary S Turner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Sinapi, Richard)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Teknor Apex Company. (Potter, Carrie)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
November 15, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1446216 ), filed by Gary S Turner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Sinapi, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. Teknor Apex Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teknor Apex Company
Represented By: Matthew C. Reeber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary S Turner
Represented By: Richard A. Sinapi
Represented By: Chloe A. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?