Silva v. Martin, et al
Plaintiff: Gerald J. Silva
Defendant: Wilder Arboleda, Corporation Director Gary Berdugo, Herman Yipi, Daniel W. Martin, Ron Lavante and Agostinno Silva
Case Number: 1:2019cv00596
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: William E Smith
2 Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER - based on the Court's on-the-record phone conference with Plaintiff, during which he confirmed that the complaint that he filed as the opening pleading in this case was intended to be an improvement on the pleading in his already pending case (19-479), and at Plaintiff's request, this case is hereby dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a) without prejudice to the foregoing complaint being filed in 19-479 as an amended complaint. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 12/2/2019. (Noel, Jeannine)
December 2, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan: TELEPHONIC Motion Hearing held on 12/2/2019 re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Gerald J. Silva (Plaintiff Silva by phone) Court addresses Plaintiff; Plaintiff addresses Court; Order to follow (Court Reporter FTR in Courtroom B at 11:44 am.) (Noel, Jeannine)
November 19, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis : TELEPHONIC Motion Hearing set for 12/2/2019 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom B before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Saucier, Martha)
November 19, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred for determination to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Barletta, Barbara)
November 18, 2019 Case reassigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. Chief Judge William E. Smith no longer assigned to the case. (Related Case: 1:19-cv-479-JJM-PAS) (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 Letter from Gerald Silva (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Hicks, Alyson)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Gerald J. Silva. (Hicks, Alyson)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Gerald J. Silva. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Part 2, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hicks, Alyson) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/15/2019: #3 Envelope) (Hicks, Alyson).
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 Letter from Gerald Silva (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Hicks, Alyson)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Gerald J. Silva. (Hicks, Alyson)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Gerald J. Silva. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Part 2, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hicks, Alyson) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/15/2019: #3 Envelope) (Hicks, Alyson).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silva v. Martin, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilder Arboleda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporation Director Gary Berdugo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herman Yipi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel W. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Lavante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agostinno Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald J. Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?