Doe v. United States Department of Justice et al
Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: Uttam Dhillon, United States Drug Enforcement Administration, United States Department of Justice and William P Barr
Case Number: 1:2019cv00597
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: Mary S McElroy
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 05:7703
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 24, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE In Opposition to #4 MOTION for Reconsideration As To This Court's Text Order of Dec. 11, 2019, and Response In Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed Under a Under a Pseudonym (Docket No. #2 ) filed by John Doe. Replies due by 12/31/2019. (Tamuleviz, Charles)
December 13, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Reconsideration As To This Court's Text Order of Dec. 11, 2019, and Response In Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed Under a Under a Pseudonym (Docket No. #2 ) filed by United States Department of Justice. Responses due by 12/27/2019. (Cunha, Zachary)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting as unopposed #2 Motion to Proceed under a Pseudonym - So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 12/11/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to William P Barr, Uttam Dhillon, United States Department of Justice, United States Drug Enforcement Administration. (Attachments: #1 Dhillon Summons, #2 DEA Summons, #3 Barr Summons)(Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
November 15, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed Under a Pseudonym filed by John Doe. Responses due by 11/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum)(Tamuleviz, Charles)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00 receipt number 0103-1446464 ) filed by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to William P Barr, Uttam Dhillon, United States Department of Justice, United States Drug Enforcement Administration. (Attachments: #1 Dhillon Summons, #2 DEA Summons, #3 Barr Summons)(Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
November 15, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed Under a Pseudonym filed by John Doe. Responses due by 11/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum)(Tamuleviz, Charles)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00 receipt number 0103-1446464 ) filed by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Farrell Pletcher, Paula)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. United States Department of Justice et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uttam Dhillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Drug Enforcement Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Represented By: Zachary A. Cunha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Charles A. Tamuleviz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?