Hemingway v. Blanchette
Plaintiff: Bobby Hemingway
Defendant: Edward A. Blanchette
Case Number: 1:2019cv00603
Filed: November 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 Filing 7 Letter sent to Bobby Hemingway requesting that the Process Receipt and Return form (USM-285) and summons be completed in order for the U.S. Marshals Service to effectuate service pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3). USM -285 form can be found by clicking # here. (Hicks, Alyson)
January 7, 2020 CORRECTIVE DOCKET ENTRY Regarding: #6 Letter sent to Effectuate Service. Incorrect form selected. Clerk to re-docket. (Hicks, Alyson)
January 7, 2020 Filing 6 Letter sent to Bobby Hemingway requesting that the Process Receipt and Return form (USM-285) and summons be completed in order for the U.S. Marshals Service to effectuate service pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3). USM -285 form can be found by clicking # here. (Hicks, Alyson)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Court waives the initial partial filing fee. Federal Medical Center - Devens is directed to forward to the Court each month twenty percent (20%) of the previous month's balance in Plaintiff's account each time the amount in the account exceeds $10.00 until Plaintiff has paid the entire filing fee of $350.00. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 1/7/2020. (Noel, Jeannine)
January 6, 2020 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Bobby Hemingway. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Bobby Hemingway - Plaintiff is instructed to provide by January 13, 2020, a certified copy of his prisoner trust fund account statement for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of his complaint on November 19, 2019. The Court will rule on the Motion once that document has been received. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 12/16/2019. (Noel, Jeannine)
December 13, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred for determination to Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Jackson, Ryan)
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Bobby Hemingway. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Hicks, Alyson)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Bobby Hemingway. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(Hicks, Alyson)
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Bobby Hemingway. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Hicks, Alyson)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Bobby Hemingway. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(Hicks, Alyson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hemingway v. Blanchette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Hemingway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward A. Blanchette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?