U.S. Bank National Association as Trustee for CVI LCF Mortgage Loan Trust I vs. Dufour, et al.
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association as Trustee for CVI LCF Mortgage Loan Trust I
Defendant: Suzanne J. Dufour and Royal C. Dufour
Case Number: 1:2019cv00622
Filed: November 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by U.S. Bank National Association as Trustee for CVI LCF Mortgage Loan Trust I. Suzanne J. Dufour served on 12/16/2019, answer due 1/6/2020. (O'Shaughnessy, Eileen)
January 15, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by U.S. Bank National Association as Trustee for CVI LCF Mortgage Loan Trust I. Royal C. Dufour served on 12/16/2019, answer due 1/6/2020. (O'Shaughnessy, Eileen)
January 9, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Royal Dufour and Suzanne Dufour (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Envelope) (Hicks, Alyson) Modified on 1/9/2020 to correct event (Barletta, Barbara).
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: The Court will treat the defendants' #6 Letter as a pro se Answer to the Complaint and will schedule a rule 16 conference - So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 1/9/2020. (Barletta, Barbara)
November 26, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Royal C. Dufour, Suzanne J. Dufour. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Hicks, Alyson)
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
November 26, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Hicks, Alyson)
November 25, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by U.S. Bank National Association as Trustee for CVI LCF Mortgage Loan Trust I. (O'Shaughnessy, Eileen)
November 25, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by U.S. Bank National Association as Trustee for CVI LCF Mortgage Loan Trust I. (O'Shaughnessy, Eileen)
November 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by U.S. Bank National Association as Trustee for CVI LCF Mortgage Loan Trust I of Availability of Loss Mitigation and Mediation Programs (O'Shaughnessy, Eileen)
November 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by U.S. Bank National Association as Trustee for CVI LCF Mortgage Loan Trust I of Availability of Loss Mitigation and Mediation Programs (O'Shaughnessy, Eileen)
November 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1450705 ), filed by U.S. Bank National Association as Trustee for CVI LCF Mortgage Loan Trust I. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-12, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons - Royal C. Dufour, #4 Summons - Suzanne J. Dufour)(O'Shaughnessy, Eileen)
November 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1450705 ), filed by U.S. Bank National Association as Trustee for CVI LCF Mortgage Loan Trust I. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-12, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons - Royal C. Dufour, #4 Summons - Suzanne J. Dufour)(O'Shaughnessy, Eileen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank National Association as Trustee for CVI LCF Mortgage Loan Trust I vs. Dufour, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne J. Dufour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal C. Dufour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association as Trustee for CVI LCF Mortgage Loan Trust I
Represented By: Eileen C. O'Shaughnessy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?