Acker v. Milco National Constructors Inc.
Plaintiff: Daniel Acker
Defendant: Milco National Constructors Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00640
Filed: December 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Milco National Constructors Inc..(Pogue, Mark)
January 16, 2020 Reset Deadlines: Milco National Constructors Inc. answer due 1/24/2020 pursuant to #5 Stipulation filed by Milco National Constructors Inc. (Jackson, Ryan)
January 3, 2020 Filing 5 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint filed by Milco National Constructors Inc.. (Pogue, Mark)
January 3, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A. Pogue on behalf of Milco National Constructors Inc. (Pogue, Mark)
December 6, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Milco National Constructors Inc.. (Hicks, Alyson)
December 6, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
December 6, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hicks, Alyson)
December 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1453676 ), filed by Daniel Acker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Dolinger, Barry)
December 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1453676 ), filed by Daniel Acker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Dolinger, Barry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acker v. Milco National Constructors Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Acker
Represented By: Barry L. Dolinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milco National Constructors Inc.
Represented By: Mark A. Pogue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?