Johnson et al v. The Narragansett Electric Company d/b/a National Grid et al
Plaintiff: Nick Harvey, Bekki Schenker, Stuart Hebb, Victoria Mele, Shawn McKenna, Gail Johnson, Richard Hyde, Patrick Kennedy, Sandy Tarr and Mick Harvey
Defendant: National Grid LNG, LLC, National Grid USA, The Narragansett Electric Company, National Grid USA Service Company, Inc, National Grid, PLC, Enbridge, Inc. and Algonquin Gas Transmission Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00643
Filed: December 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or file responsive pleading - Reset Deadlines: Algonquin Gas Transmission Company answer due 3/17/2020; National Grid LNG, LLC answer due 3/17/2020; The Narragansett Electric Company answer due 3/17/2020. - So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 1/30/2020. (Barletta, Barbara)
January 29, 2020 Filing 14 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer re #13 Amended Complaint filed by Algonquin Gas Transmission Company, National Grid LNG, LLC, National Grid USA, National Grid USA Service Company, Inc, National Grid, PLC, The Narragansett Electric Company. Responses due by 2/12/2020. (Ramos, Adam)
January 13, 2020 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Algonquin Gas Transmission Company, National Grid LNG, LLC, The Narragansett Electric Company filed by plaintiffs - (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Barletta, Barbara)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting as unopposed #12 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint- So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 1/13/2020 (Barletta, Barbara)
January 7, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Amend/Correct The First Amended Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 1/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Second Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit A to Complaint, #3 Exhibit B to Complaint)(Cunha, Brian)
December 17, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M. Duffy on behalf of Algonquin Gas Transmission Company (Duffy, Robert)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #10 Notice of dismissal of claims without prejudice as to Embridge, Inc. - So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 12/17/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
December 16, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by Gail Johnson of Dismissal against Enbridge, Inc. (Cunha, Brian)
December 16, 2019 Filing 9 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Hicks, Alyson)
December 16, 2019 Filing 8 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer or Respond to the Amended Complaint filed by Algonquin Gas Transmission Company, National Grid LNG, LLC, National Grid USA, National Grid USA Service Company, Inc, National Grid, PLC, The Narragansett Electric Company. Responses due by 12/30/2019. (Ramos, Adam)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; RESET DEADLINES: Algonquin Gas Transmission Company, National Grid LNG, LLC., National Grid USA, National Grid USA Service Company, National Grid PLC and the Narragansett Electric Company answer due 2/14/20- So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 12/16/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
December 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda A. Garganese on behalf of National Grid LNG, LLC, National Grid USA, National Grid USA Service Company, Inc, National Grid, PLC, The Narragansett Electric Company (Garganese, Amanda)
December 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam M. Ramos on behalf of National Grid LNG, LLC, National Grid USA, National Grid USA Service Company, Inc, National Grid, PLC, The Narragansett Electric Company (Ramos, Adam)
December 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Wollin on behalf of National Grid LNG, LLC, National Grid USA, National Grid USA Service Company, Inc, National Grid, PLC, The Narragansett Electric Company (Wollin, David)
December 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by National Grid LNG, LLC, National Grid USA, National Grid USA Service Company, Inc, National Grid, PLC, The Narragansett Electric Company re Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal (Petros, Gerald)
December 9, 2019 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
December 9, 2019 CASE PERMANENTLY ASSIGNED: Since Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. has determined that this case is in fact related to CA 19-642, this case is permanently assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. for all further proceedings (Barletta, Barbara)
December 9, 2019 CASE CONDITIONALLY ASSIGNED to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. Related Case Number CA19-642-JJM-LDA based upon the indication on the cover sheet that a related case previously was assigned to the presiding judge. The assignment is subject to the presiding judge's determination that the cases, in fact, are related. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
December 6, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet filed by National Grid LNG, LLC, National Grid USA, National Grid USA Service Company, Inc, The Narragansett Electric Company. Regarding New Case: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, . (Petros, Gerald)
December 6, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet filed by National Grid LNG, LLC, National Grid USA, National Grid USA Service Company, Inc, The Narragansett Electric Company. Regarding New Case: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, . (Petros, Gerald)
December 6, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Newport County Superior Court, Case Number NC-2019-0035. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1454134, filed by National Grid LNG, LLC, National Grid USA Service Company, Inc, National Grid USA, The Narragansett Electric Company d/b/a National Grid. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Petros, Gerald)
December 6, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Newport County Superior Court, Case Number NC-2019-0035. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1454134, filed by National Grid LNG, LLC, National Grid USA Service Company, Inc, National Grid USA, The Narragansett Electric Company d/b/a National Grid. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Petros, Gerald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson et al v. The Narragansett Electric Company d/b/a National Grid et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nick Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bekki Schenker
Represented By: Brian R. Cunha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stuart Hebb
Represented By: Brian R. Cunha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Mele
Represented By: Brian R. Cunha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn McKenna
Represented By: Brian R. Cunha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail Johnson
Represented By: Brian R. Cunha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Hyde
Represented By: Brian R. Cunha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Kennedy
Represented By: Brian R. Cunha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandy Tarr
Represented By: Brian R. Cunha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mick Harvey
Represented By: Brian R. Cunha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Grid LNG, LLC
Represented By: Gerald J. Petros
Represented By: Amanda A. Garganese
Represented By: Adam M. Ramos
Represented By: David A. Wollin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Grid USA
Represented By: Gerald J. Petros
Represented By: Amanda A. Garganese
Represented By: Adam M. Ramos
Represented By: David A. Wollin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Narragansett Electric Company
Represented By: Gerald J. Petros
Represented By: Amanda A. Garganese
Represented By: Adam M. Ramos
Represented By: David A. Wollin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Grid USA Service Company, Inc
Represented By: Gerald J. Petros
Represented By: Amanda A. Garganese
Represented By: Adam M. Ramos
Represented By: David A. Wollin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Grid, PLC
Represented By: Amanda A. Garganese
Represented By: Adam M. Ramos
Represented By: David A. Wollin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enbridge, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Algonquin Gas Transmission Company
Represented By: Robert M. Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?