Ashley v. Biscayne Entertainment Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sharon Ashley
Defendant: Christopher Vianello, Michael D'Ambra and Biscayne Entertainment Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00647
Filed: December 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2020 Filing 9 Process Return and Receipt Executed by United States Marshal, SUMMONS Returned Executed Biscayne Entertainment Inc. served on 1/28/2020, answer due 2/18/2020. (Hicks, Alyson)
January 14, 2020 DOCKET NOTE: Summonses forwarded to USMS for service. Regarding: #8 Summons Issued, #6 Summons Issued. (Hicks, Alyson)
January 14, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Michael D'Ambra. (Hicks, Alyson)
January 14, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Request filed by Sharon Ashley. (Kurland, Shannah)
January 9, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Biscayne Entertainment Inc.. (Hicks, Alyson)
January 9, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Request filed by Sharon Ashley. (Kurland, Shannah)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 12/16/2019. (Noel, Jeannine)
December 13, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred for determination to Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Jackson, Ryan)
December 10, 2019 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
December 10, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hicks, Alyson)
December 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Sharon Ashley. (Kurland, Shannah)
December 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA, Waived by Statute, or IFP.), filed by Sharon Ashley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Appendix)(Kurland, Shannah)
December 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Sharon Ashley. (Kurland, Shannah)
December 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA, Waived by Statute, or IFP.), filed by Sharon Ashley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Appendix)(Kurland, Shannah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ashley v. Biscayne Entertainment Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Ashley
Represented By: Shannah M. Kurland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Vianello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael D'Ambra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biscayne Entertainment Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?