United States of America for the Use of United Steel, Inc. v. Federal Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: United States of America for the Use of United Steel, Inc.
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company and Brican, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00668
Filed: December 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40 U.S.C. ยง 270
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entering #7 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by United States of America for the Use of United Steel, Inc. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 2/4/2020. (Jackson, Ryan)
January 30, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by United States of America for the Use of United Steel, Inc. of Voluntary Dismissal (Kohm, Katharine)
January 15, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by United States of America for the Use of United Steel, Inc. upon Brican, Inc. served on 1/14/2020, answer due 2/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Kohm, Katharine)
January 9, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by United States of America for the Use of United Steel, Inc. Federal Insurance Company served on 12/31/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Kohm, Katharine)
December 27, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Brican, Inc. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
December 27, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Brican, Inc. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
December 27, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Federal Insurance Company. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
December 27, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Federal Insurance Company. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
December 27, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
December 27, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
December 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1459927 ), filed by United States of America for the Use of United Steel, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Kohm, Katharine)
December 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1459927 ), filed by United States of America for the Use of United Steel, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Kohm, Katharine)
December 27, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
December 27, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America for the Use of United Steel, Inc. v. Federal Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brican, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America for the Use of United Steel, Inc.
Represented By: R. Thomas Dunn
Represented By: Katharine E. Kohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?