Susana P. v. Saul
Plaintiff: Susana Pimental
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
In Re: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2019cv00670
Filed: December 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by James J. Nagelberg on behalf of Andrew M Saul (Nagelberg, James)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER denying as moot #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 2/14/2020. (Noel, Jeannine)
February 14, 2020 Filing fee: $400.00, receipt number 0103-1475474.(Simoncelli, Michael)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER re #2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Susana Pimental. Plaintiff's counsel is further advised that IFP affidavits must be originally signed by the plaintiff and that /s/ electronic signatures are not authorized for this purpose by the applicable rules. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 1/27/2020. (Noel, Jeannine)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER re #2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Susana Pimental. By motion, Plaintiff alleges "financial desperation" and has completed an application seeking in forma pauperis ("IFP") status under 28 U.S.C. section 1915. However, after reviewing her submission, the Court concludes that it needs additional financial information to rule on Plaintiff's request. Although Plaintiff reports that she has no income and typical household monthly expenses, she also indicates that she owns a home and has a significant sum of cash on hand and/or in an account. In order to permit the Court to rule on her IFP request, Plaintiff shall submit, by February 14, 2020, a supplemental declaration which estimates the available equity in her home and reports all other sources of household income or support contributing towards her and/or the household's regular monthly expenses. After receiving this additional information, the Court will rule on Plaintiff's pending request for IFP status. Plaintiff is advised that failure to file such supplemental declaration or, alternatively, the required civil case filing fee by February 14, 2020, may result in this case being dismissed without prejudice. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 1/21/2020. (Noel, Jeannine)
January 21, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #4 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred for determination to Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Jackson, Ryan)
January 16, 2020 Filing 4 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Susana Pimental. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Nesselbush, Donna)
January 16, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred for determination to Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Jackson, Ryan)
December 30, 2019 NOTICE to Parties of Right to Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Parties who elect to consent must complete the Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form within 14 days. # Please click here to access the form . Consent to Assignment of Magistrate Judge due by 1/13/2020. (Hicks, Alyson)
December 30, 2019 Filing 3 SOCIAL SECURITY CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED.# Personal Identifier Statement due 12/31/2019. (Hicks, Alyson)
December 30, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hicks, Alyson)
December 30, 2019 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Susana Pimental. (Nesselbush, Donna)
December 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA, Waived by Statute, or IFP.), filed by Susana Pimental. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Nesselbush, Donna)
December 30, 2019 NOTICE to Parties of Right to Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Parties who elect to consent must complete the Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form within 14 days. # Please click here to access the form . Consent to Assignment of Magistrate Judge due by 1/13/2020. (Hicks, Alyson)
December 30, 2019 Filing 3 SOCIAL SECURITY CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED.# Personal Identifier Statement due 12/31/2019. (Hicks, Alyson)
December 30, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hicks, Alyson)
December 30, 2019 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Susana Pimental. (Nesselbush, Donna)
December 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA, Waived by Statute, or IFP.), filed by Susana Pimental. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Nesselbush, Donna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Susana P. v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susana Pimental
Represented By: Donna M. Nesselbush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Represented By: James J. Nagelberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?