Pullano, et al v. Rhode Island Division of State Fire Marshal et al
Plaintiff: RI Rapid Restoration, Inc., Stephen Reardon, P.A., Providence Fire Restoration, Inc., Christopher Synnott, P.A., Justin Petrin, P.A., All Star Construction, Inc., Clean Care of New England, Inc., Maria Tirocchi Femino, P.A., Disaster Restoration Group, Inc., Ernest G Pullano, PA, Vernon S. Rainville, P.A. and Smoke Clean of MA, Inc.
Defendant: Rhode Island Division of State Fire Marshal, Peter F. Neronha, Liz Tanner and James Gumbley
Case Number: 1:2020cv00020
Filed: January 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to file memorandum in support of objection to #10 MOTION to Dismiss . ; Set/Reset Deadlines: ( Response memorandum due by 4/17/2020.); a new reply date will be set once the memorandum has been filed- So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 2/7/2020. (Barletta, Barbara)
February 6, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Memorandum in Support of Objection to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 2/20/2020. (Tarro, Thomas)
February 6, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE In Opposition to #10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. Replies due by 2/13/2020. (Tarro, Thomas)
February 4, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Defendants. Responses due by 2/18/2020. (Shea, Andrea)
February 4, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea M. Shea on behalf of All Defendants (Shea, Andrea)
February 4, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean H. Lyness on behalf of All Defendants (Lyness, Sean)
January 16, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Providence Fire Restoration, Inc., Disaster Restoration Group, Inc., Stephen Reardon, P.A., Ernest G Pullano, PA, Vernon S. Rainville, P.A., Christopher Synnott, P.A., RI Rapid Restoration, Inc., Clean Care of New England, Inc., All Star Construction, Inc., Justin Petrin, P.A., Smoke Clean of MA, Inc., Maria Tirocchi Femino, P.A.. Rhode Island Division of State Fire Marshal served on 1/16/2020, answer due 2/6/2020. (Tarro, Thomas)
January 16, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Providence Fire Restoration, Inc., Disaster Restoration Group, Inc., Stephen Reardon, P.A., Ernest G Pullano, PA, Vernon S. Rainville, P.A., Christopher Synnott, P.A., RI Rapid Restoration, Inc., Clean Care of New England, Inc., All Star Construction, Inc., Justin Petrin, P.A., Smoke Clean of MA, Inc., Maria Tirocchi Femino, P.A.. James Gumbley served on 1/16/2020, answer due 2/6/2020. (Tarro, Thomas)
January 16, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Providence Fire Restoration, Inc., Disaster Restoration Group, Inc., Stephen Reardon, P.A., Ernest G Pullano, PA, Vernon S. Rainville, P.A., Christopher Synnott, P.A., RI Rapid Restoration, Inc., Clean Care of New England, Inc., All Star Construction, Inc., Justin Petrin, P.A., Smoke Clean of MA, Inc., Maria Tirocchi Femino, P.A.. Peter F. Neronha served on 1/16/2020, answer due 2/6/2020. (Tarro, Thomas)
January 16, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Providence Fire Restoration, Inc., Disaster Restoration Group, Inc., Stephen Reardon, P.A., Ernest G Pullano, PA, Vernon S. Rainville, P.A., Christopher Synnott, P.A., RI Rapid Restoration, Inc., Clean Care of New England, Inc., All Star Construction, Inc., Justin Petrin, P.A., Smoke Clean of MA, Inc., Maria Tirocchi Femino, P.A.. Liz Tanner served on 1/16/2020, answer due 2/6/2020. (Tarro, Thomas)
January 15, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Hicks, Alyson)
January 15, 2020 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
January 15, 2020 Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Hicks, Alyson)
January 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1464922 ), filed by Providence Fire Restoration, Inc., Disaster Restoration Group, Inc., Stephen Reardon, P.A., Enrnest G. Pullano P.A. D/B/A Pullano Public Adjusters, LLC, Vernon S. Rainville, P.A., Christopher Synnott, P.A., RI Rapid Restoration, Inc., Clean Care of New England, Inc., All Star Construction, Inc., Justin Petrin, P.A., Smoke Clean of MA, Inc., Maria Tirocchi Femino, P.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Tarro, Thomas)
January 15, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Hicks, Alyson)
January 15, 2020 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
January 15, 2020 Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Hicks, Alyson)
January 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1464922 ), filed by Providence Fire Restoration, Inc., Disaster Restoration Group, Inc., Stephen Reardon, P.A., Enrnest G. Pullano P.A. D/B/A Pullano Public Adjusters, LLC, Vernon S. Rainville, P.A., Christopher Synnott, P.A., RI Rapid Restoration, Inc., Clean Care of New England, Inc., All Star Construction, Inc., Justin Petrin, P.A., Smoke Clean of MA, Inc., Maria Tirocchi Femino, P.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Tarro, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pullano, et al v. Rhode Island Division of State Fire Marshal et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhode Island Division of State Fire Marshal
Represented By: Sean H. Lyness
Represented By: Andrea M. Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter F. Neronha
Represented By: Sean H. Lyness
Represented By: Andrea M. Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liz Tanner
Represented By: Sean H. Lyness
Represented By: Andrea M. Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Gumbley
Represented By: Sean H. Lyness
Represented By: Andrea M. Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RI Rapid Restoration, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas A. Tarro, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Reardon, P.A.
Represented By: Thomas A. Tarro, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Providence Fire Restoration, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas A. Tarro, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Synnott, P.A.
Represented By: Thomas A. Tarro, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Petrin, P.A.
Represented By: Thomas A. Tarro, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: All Star Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas A. Tarro, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clean Care of New England, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas A. Tarro, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Tirocchi Femino, P.A.
Represented By: Thomas A. Tarro, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Disaster Restoration Group, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas A. Tarro, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest G Pullano, PA
Represented By: Thomas A. Tarro, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vernon S. Rainville, P.A.
Represented By: Thomas A. Tarro, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Smoke Clean of MA, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas A. Tarro, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?