H.R.M., Inc. v. DeMarco et al
Plaintiff: H.R.M., Inc.
Defendant: M/Y CATCHIN TIME, Kevin J. DeMarco and Donna DeMarco
Case Number: 1:2020cv00023
Filed: January 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2020 Filing 9 CLAIM to Vessel by Donna DeMarco, Kevin J. DeMarco, M/Y CATCHIN TIME. (Sheehan, Stephen)
March 13, 2020 Filing 8 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint by Donna DeMarco, Kevin J. DeMarco, M/Y CATCHIN TIME.(Sheehan, Stephen)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Donald K. McLean. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 3/9/2020. (Hicks, Alyson)
March 9, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Donald K. McLean to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1482066 ) filed by All Defendants. (Sheehan, Stephen)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER waiving service of process and setting 3/6/20 for the DeMarco defendants to answer and file a statement of interest - - So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 2/24/2020. (Barletta, Barbara)
February 19, 2020 Filing 5 STIPULATION and (Proposed) Order filed by H.R.M., Inc.. (Fulweiler, John)
February 13, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen P. Sheehan on behalf of All Defendants (Sheehan, Stephen)
January 16, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Donna DeMarco, Kevin J. DeMarco. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Potter, Carrie)
January 16, 2020 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
January 16, 2020 Case reassigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
January 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1465731 ), filed by H.R.M., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons - Kevin J. DeMarco, #4 Summons - Donna DeMarco)(Fulweiler, John)
January 16, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Donna DeMarco, Kevin J. DeMarco. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Potter, Carrie)
January 16, 2020 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
January 16, 2020 Case reassigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
January 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1465731 ), filed by H.R.M., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons - Kevin J. DeMarco, #4 Summons - Donna DeMarco)(Fulweiler, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: H.R.M., Inc. v. DeMarco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/Y CATCHIN TIME
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin J. DeMarco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna DeMarco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H.R.M., Inc.
Represented By: John K. Fulweiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?