Tatro v. Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC
Plaintiff: Michael P. Tatro
Defendant: Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00038
Filed: January 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: Mary S McElroy
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2020 Filing 10 Letter from Michael Tatro. Docket Sheet sent 3/9/20. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Hicks, Alyson)
February 24, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Issue New Summonses filed by Michael P. Tatro. Responses due by 3/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Hicks, Alyson)
February 24, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File Document (Amended Proof of Service) filed by Michael P. Tatro. Responses due by 3/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Envelope)(Hicks, Alyson)
February 4, 2020 Filing 7 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Hicks, Alyson)
February 4, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC.(Dwyer, Paul)
January 28, 2020 Filing 5 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
January 28, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hicks, Alyson)
January 28, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul E. Dwyer on behalf of All Defendants (Dwyer, Paul)
January 28, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC. (Watts, Clint)
January 28, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Clint D. Watts on behalf of All Defendants (Watts, Clint)
January 28, 2020 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kent County Superior Court, Case Number KC-2019-1397. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1468899, filed by Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Watts, Clint)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tatro v. Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC
Represented By: Paul E. Dwyer
Represented By: Clint D. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael P. Tatro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?