International Brotherhood of Teamsters Local 251 v. DHLNH, LLC et al
Plaintiff: International Brotherhood of Teamsters Local 251
Defendant: DHL Express, (USA), Inc. and DHLNH, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00076
Filed: February 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2020 Filing 15 Writ of Attachment Issued as to DHLNH, LLC. (Barletta, Barbara)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #12 MOTION to Attach and Preliminary Injunction filed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters Local 251 - So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 3/24/2020. (Barletta, Barbara)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting as unopposed #12 Motion to Attach and for Preliminary Injunction- So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 3/24/2020. (Barletta, Barbara)
March 9, 2020 Filing 13 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by International Brotherhood of Teamsters Local 251 in support of #12 MOTION to Attach and Preliminary Injunction in Support of Prejudgment Attachment and Preliminary Injunction. (Wiens, Elizabeth)
March 9, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Attach and Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 3/23/2020. (Wiens, Elizabeth)
March 9, 2020 Filing 11 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to DHLNH, LLC (Hicks, Alyson)
March 9, 2020 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Clerk's Entry of Default filed by All Plaintiffs as to DHLNH, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Wiens, Elizabeth)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to DHL Express(USA), LLC.- So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 2/19/2020. (Barletta, Barbara)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #4 Motion for TRO- So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 2/18/2020. (Barletta, Barbara)
February 18, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.: Telephonic TRO Conference held on 2/18/2020; Elizabeth A. Wiens for plaintiff; Robert Fisher and Sarah Sweeney for DHL Express (Barletta, Barbara)
February 18, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by International Brotherhood of Teamsters Local 251 of Voluntary Dismissal as to DHL Express, (USA), LLC ONLY (Wiens, Elizabeth)
February 18, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by International Brotherhood of Teamsters Local 251 re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction pursuant to Rule 65(b) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Wiens, Elizabeth)
February 17, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters Local 251. All Plaintiffs. (Wiens, Elizabeth)
February 17, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters Local 251. All Plaintiffs. (Wiens, Elizabeth)
February 14, 2020 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic TRO Conference set for Tuesday, 2/18/2020 at 09:00 AM before Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.; Court to initiate call. Kindly provide case manager at 401-752-7202 with telephone contact information (Barletta, Barbara)
February 14, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters Local 251. (Wiens, Elizabeth)
February 13, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to DHL Express, (USA), Inc., DHLNH, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Hicks, Alyson)
February 13, 2020 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
February 13, 2020 Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Hicks, Alyson)
February 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1474859 ), filed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters Local 251. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit)(Wiens, Elizabeth)
February 13, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to DHL Express, (USA), Inc., DHLNH, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Hicks, Alyson)
February 13, 2020 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
February 13, 2020 Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Hicks, Alyson)
February 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1474859 ), filed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters Local 251. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit)(Wiens, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Brotherhood of Teamsters Local 251 v. DHLNH, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DHL Express, (USA), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DHLNH, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Brotherhood of Teamsters Local 251
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Wiens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?