United States of America v. Real Property Located at 460 E. Pershing Avenue, York, Pennsylvania et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Real Property Located at E. Princess Street, York, Pennsylvania, Real Property Located at 1142 E. Poplar Street, York, Pennsylvania, Real Property Located at 460 E. Pershing Avenue, York, Pennsylvania, Real Property Located at 561 W. Princess Street, York, Pennsylvania, Real Property Located at 520 S. Queen Street, York, Pennsylvania, Real Property Located at 542 S. Queen Street, York, Pennsylvania, Real Property Located at 929 W. Poplar Street, York, Pennsylvania, Real Property Located at 437 Cooper Place, York, Pennsylvania and Real Property Located at 614 S. Queen Street, York, Pennsylvania
Case Number: 1:2020cv00083
Filed: February 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2020 Filing 9 WRIT of Entry issued (Barletta, Barbara)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Writ of Entry- So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 2/24/2020. (Barletta, Barbara)
February 24, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J)(Barletta, Barbara)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint - So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 2/24/2020. (Barletta, Barbara)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion to Unseal Case- So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 2/24/2020. (Barletta, Barbara)
February 21, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Writ of Entry filed by United States of America. Responses due by 3/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Writ of Entry)(Rogers, Mary)
February 21, 2020 Filing 6 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #2 Complaint As A Matter of Course filed by United States of America. Responses due by 3/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Verified Complaint, #2 Exhibit Declaration, #3 Exhibit Deed Description A, #4 Exhibit Deed Description B, #5 Exhibit Deed Description C, #6 Exhibit Deed Description D, #7 Exhibit Deed Description E, #8 Exhibit Deed Description F, #9 Exhibit Deed Description G, #10 Exhibit Deed Description H, #11 Exhibit Deed Description I, #12 Exhibit vDeed Description J)(Rogers, Mary)
February 21, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Unseal Case and Lift Stay filed by United States of America. (Rogers, Mary)
February 20, 2020 Filing 4 WRIT of Entry issued (Barletta, Barbara) (Main Document 4 replaced on 2/20/2020) (Barletta, Barbara).
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Writ of Entry- So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 2/20/2020. (Barletta, Barbara)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #1 Motion to Seal Case- So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 2/20/2020. (Barletta, Barbara)
February 19, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Writ of Entry filed by United States of America. Responses due by 3/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Writ of Entry)(Potter, Carrie)
February 19, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Declaration of Special Agent Brendan Cullen)(Potter, Carrie)
February 19, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Seal and Stay Case filed by United States of America. (Potter, Carrie) Modified on 2/19/2020 (Potter, Carrie).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Real Property Located at 460 E. Pershing Avenue, York, Pennsylvania et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property Located at E. Princess Street, York, Pennsylvania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property Located at 1142 E. Poplar Street, York, Pennsylvania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property Located at 460 E. Pershing Avenue, York, Pennsylvania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property Located at 561 W. Princess Street, York, Pennsylvania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property Located at 520 S. Queen Street, York, Pennsylvania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property Located at 542 S. Queen Street, York, Pennsylvania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property Located at 929 W. Poplar Street, York, Pennsylvania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property Located at 437 Cooper Place, York, Pennsylvania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property Located at 614 S. Queen Street, York, Pennsylvania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Mary Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?