Specialty Cable Corp. v. DeWal Industries, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Specialty Cable Corp.
Defendant: Rogers Corporation and DeWal Industries, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00134
Filed: March 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: Mary S McElroy
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DeWal Industries, LLC, Rogers Corporation. (Wollin, David)
May 7, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by DeWal Industries, LLC, Rogers Corporation.(Wollin, David)
March 30, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Wollin on behalf of DeWal Industries, LLC, Rogers Corporation (Wollin, David)
March 30, 2020 Filing 9 Joint STIPULATION re #1 Complaint filed by DeWal Industries, LLC, Rogers Corporation. (Wollin, David)
March 20, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Specialty Cable Corp.. Rogers Corporation served on 3/17/2020, answer due 4/7/2020. (Robinson, Michael)
March 20, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Specialty Cable Corp.. DeWal Industries, LLC served on 3/17/2020, answer due 4/7/2020. (Robinson, Michael)
March 17, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas A. Giron on behalf of Specialty Cable Corp. (McGuire, Vickie)
March 16, 2020 Filing 5 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
March 16, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Rogers Corporation. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
March 16, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
March 16, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward D. Pare, III on behalf of Specialty Cable Corp. (Pare, Edward)
March 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Robinson on behalf of Specialty Cable Corp. (Robinson, Michael)
March 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1484130 ), filed by Specialty Cable Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Robinson, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Specialty Cable Corp. v. DeWal Industries, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rogers Corporation
Represented By: David A. Wollin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeWal Industries, LLC
Represented By: David A. Wollin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Specialty Cable Corp.
Represented By: Michael P. Robinson
Represented By: Edward D. Pare, III
Represented By: Douglas A. Giron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?