Lincoln Business Center, LLC v. Sid Tool Co., Inc.
Plaintiff: Lincoln Business Center, LLC
Defendant: Sid Tool Co., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00145
Filed: March 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #6 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Lincoln Business Center, LLC.(Garrahy, John)
April 20, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Lincoln Business Center, LLC by Sid Tool Co., Inc..(Hughes, Brian)
March 27, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sid Tool Co., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent MSC Industrial Direct Co., Inc for Sid Tool Co., Inc... (Kresge, Lisa)
March 26, 2020 Filing 4 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Hicks, Alyson)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Brian J. Hughes. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 3/26/20. (Hicks, Alyson)
March 25, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Brian J. Hughes to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1486490 ) filed by Sid Tool Co., Inc.. (Kresge, Lisa)
March 25, 2020 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
March 25, 2020 Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hicks, Alyson)
March 25, 2020 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2020-02117. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1486457, filed by Sid Tool Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Filings (Summons and Verified Complaint))(Kresge, Lisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lincoln Business Center, LLC v. Sid Tool Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lincoln Business Center, LLC
Represented By: John J. Garrahy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sid Tool Co., Inc.
Represented By: Brian J. Hughes
Represented By: Lisa M. Kresge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?