Glocester Country Club v. Scottsdale Indemnity Company
Plaintiff: Glocester Country Club
Defendant: Scottsdale Indemnity Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv00184
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER:Pursuant to Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the parties are directed to begin their mandatory disclosures immediately, before the Rule 16 conference. To the extent that the parties wish to begin discovery on a cooperative basis prior to the initial conference, they are encouraged to do so. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 5/26/2020. (Jackson, Ryan)
May 20, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by Scottsdale Indemnity Company of Withdrawal of Kristen Whittle/Entry of Appearance of Stephen Adams (Whittle, Kristen)
May 20, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by Scottsdale Indemnity Company.(Benner, Melissa)
May 18, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Scottsdale Indemnity Company, filed by Glocester Country Club.(Potter, Carrie)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 5/18/2020. (Jackson, Ryan)
April 24, 2020 Filing 5 Assented MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Glocester Country Club. Responses due by 5/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Rome, Judah)
April 23, 2020 Filing 4 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Hicks, Alyson)
April 22, 2020 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
April 22, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
April 22, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Scottsdale Indemnity Compay d/b/a Nationwide. (Whittle, Kristen)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2020-02478. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1494703, filed by Scottsdale Indemnity Compay d/b/a Nationwide. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-State Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Whittle, Kristen)
April 22, 2020 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
April 22, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
April 22, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Scottsdale Indemnity Compay d/b/a Nationwide. (Whittle, Kristen)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2020-02478. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1494703, filed by Scottsdale Indemnity Compay d/b/a Nationwide. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-State Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Whittle, Kristen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glocester Country Club v. Scottsdale Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scottsdale Indemnity Company
Represented By: Melissa C. Benner
Represented By: Kristen M. Whittle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glocester Country Club
Represented By: Judah H. Rome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?