Sanchez v. LNP Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a Dominos
Plaintiff: Naomi Sanchez
Defendant: LNP Enterprises, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00209
Filed: May 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for Tuesday, 7/21/2020 at 09:30 AM before Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.; Call in instructions will be provided to counsel of record prior to the conference (Barletta, Barbara)
June 24, 2020 Filing 7 DEFENDANT'S ANSWER to Complaint by LNP Enterprises, Inc..(Horan, Monica)
June 14, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Naomi Sanchez. LNP Enterprises, Inc. served on 6/12/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (Munro-Delotto, Paige)
June 1, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Reissued as to LNP Enterprises, Inc.. (Potter, Carrie)
May 31, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Request filed by Naomi Sanchez. (Munro-Delotto, Paige)
May 11, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to LNP Enterprises, Inc. (Hicks, Alyson)
May 11, 2020 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
May 11, 2020 Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hicks, Alyson)
May 11, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to LNP Enterprises, Inc. (Hicks, Alyson)
May 11, 2020 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
May 11, 2020 Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hicks, Alyson)
May 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1500632 ), filed by NAOMI SANCHEZ. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit summons request)(Munro-Delotto, Paige)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez v. LNP Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a Dominos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LNP Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naomi Sanchez
Represented By: Paige Alexandra Munro-Delotto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?