O'Loughlin v. Monsanto Company et al
Plaintiff: Richard O'Loughlin
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv00225
Filed: May 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2020 Filing 6 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-214) transferring this case to the Northern District of California and the Honorable Vince Chhabria for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings - Ordered by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (Barletta, Barbara)
June 1, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard O'Loughlin. Monsanto Company served on 5/26/2020, answer due 6/16/2020. (Sorbello, Gregory)
May 20, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (Hicks, Alyson)
May 20, 2020 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
May 20, 2020 Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hicks, Alyson)
May 20, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Request filed by Richard O'Loughlin. (Sorbello, Gregory)
May 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1503947 ), filed by Richard O'Loughlin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sorbello, Gregory) (Attachment 1 replaced with flattened version on 5/20/2020) (Hicks, Alyson).
May 20, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (Hicks, Alyson)
May 20, 2020 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
May 20, 2020 Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hicks, Alyson)
May 20, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Request filed by Richard O'Loughlin. (Sorbello, Gregory)
May 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1503947 ), filed by Richard O'Loughlin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sorbello, Gregory) (Attachment 1 replaced with flattened version on 5/20/2020) (Hicks, Alyson).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Loughlin v. Monsanto Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard O'Loughlin
Represented By: Gregory P. Sorbello
Represented By: Peter M. Iascone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?