Simmons-Telep v. Roger Williams University
Plaintiff: Jeremy Simmons-Telep
Defendant: Roger Williams University
Case Number: 1:2020cv00226
Filed: May 21, 2020
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
2 Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Roy T. Willey, IV ; granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Eric M. Poulin. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 5/28/2020. (Potter, Carrie)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Eric M. Poulin to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1506195 ) filed by Jeremy Simmons-Telep. (Caron, Robert)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Roy T. Willey, IV to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1506192 ) filed by Jeremy Simmons-Telep. (Caron, Robert)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Roger Williams University. (Potter, Carrie)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Request filed by Jeremy Simmons-Telep. (Caron, Robert)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL entered. Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond for all further proceedings. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 5/26/2020. (Saucier, Martha)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
May 21, 2020 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
May 21, 2020 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
May 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1504284 ), filed by Jeremy Simmons-Telep. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Attorneys for Plaintiff)(Caron, Robert) (Attachment 1 replaced with flattened document on 5/21/2020) (Hicks, Alyson).
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1504284 ), filed by Jeremy Simmons-Telep. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Attorneys for Plaintiff)(Caron, Robert) (Attachment 1 replaced with flattened document on 5/21/2020) (Hicks, Alyson).
May 21, 2020 Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Hicks, Alyson)
May 21, 2020 CORRECTIVE DOCKET ENTRY Regarding: 2 Case Opening Notice. Form did not connect to this entry. Clerk re-docketed the notice. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Hicks, Alyson)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order CORRECTIVE DOCKET ENTRY Regarding: 2 Case Opening Notice. Form did not connect to this entry. Clerk re-docketed the notice. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simmons-Telep v. Roger Williams University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Simmons-Telep
Represented By: Robert J. Caron
Represented By: Roy T. Willey, IV
Represented By: Eric M. Poulin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Williams University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?