Zeigler et al v. Rockwell
Plaintiff: Sharon M. Zeigler and Robert S. Zeigler
Defendant: Jenny Rockwell
Case Number: 1:2020cv00267
Filed: June 17, 2020
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Mary S McElroy
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE In Opposition to #5 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Jenny Rockwell. Replies due by 7/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Request for Hearing)(Labonte, Nicole)
June 26, 2020 Filing 6 Reply to Counterclaim by Robert S. Zeigler, Sharon M. Zeigler. (Kyle, Keith)
June 26, 2020 Filing 5 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 7/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Kyle, Keith)
June 26, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith B. Kyle on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kyle, Keith)
June 22, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith B. Kyle on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kyle, Keith)
June 18, 2020 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
June 18, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
June 17, 2020 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Newport County Superior Court, Case Number NC-2020-0121. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1518771, filed by Jenny Rockwell. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Complaint filed in the case being removed, #2 Copy of Notice of Filing Notice of Removal to be filed in State Court, #3 Exhibits to Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Labonte, Nicole)
June 17, 2020 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Newport County Superior Court, Case Number NC-2020-0121. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1518771, filed by Jenny Rockwell. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Complaint filed in the case being removed, #2 Copy of Notice of Filing Notice of Removal to be filed in State Court, #3 Exhibits to Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Labonte, Nicole)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zeigler et al v. Rockwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon M. Zeigler
Represented By: Matthew H. Leys
Represented By: Keith B. Kyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert S. Zeigler
Represented By: Matthew H. Leys
Represented By: Keith B. Kyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenny Rockwell
Represented By: Nicole M. Labonte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?