Sylvia v. Calenda
Plaintiff: Stephen A. Sylvia
Defendant: Steven Calenda
Case Number: 1:2020cv00272
Filed: June 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Filing 19 JUDGMENT in favor of Steven Calenda against Stephen A. Sylvia(Barletta, Barbara)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Dismiss- So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 7/31/2020. (Barletta, Barbara)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to Proceed as Pro Se Electronic Filer- So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 7/20/2020. (Barletta, Barbara)
July 15, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE In Opposition to #11 MOTION to Dismiss in Lieu of Answering Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Stephen A. Sylvia. Replies due by 7/22/2020. (Potter, Carrie)
July 15, 2020 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Stephen A. Sylvia in support of #10 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Potter, Carrie)
July 15, 2020 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Stephen A. Sylvia in support of #9 MOTION for Injunction Relief Asset Freeze . (Potter, Carrie)
July 15, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Proceed as Pro Se Electronic Filer filed by Stephen A. Sylvia. (Potter, Carrie)
July 8, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Vacate filed by Stephen A. Sylvia. Responses due by 7/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie) (Main Document 13 replaced on 7/14/2020) (Potter, Carrie). (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/14/2020) (Potter, Carrie).
July 8, 2020 Filing 12 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Potter, Carrie)
July 2, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss in Lieu of Answering Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Steven Calenda. Responses due by 7/16/2020. (DeSisto, Marc)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER denying without prejudice #9 MOTION for Injunction Relief Asset Freeze and denying without prejudice #10 Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendant has not yet filed a responsive pleading- So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 6/29/2020. (Barletta, Barbara)
June 26, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Stephen A. Sylvia. Responses due by 7/10/2020. (Potter, Carrie)
June 26, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Injunction Relief Asset Freeze filed by Stephen A. Sylvia. Responses due by 7/10/2020. (Potter, Carrie)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER denying without prejudice #5 Motion to Dismiss- So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 6/25/2020. (Barletta, Barbara)
June 25, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Steven Calenda filed by Stephen A. Sylvia.(Barletta, Barbara)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #7 MOTION to Amend Complaint - So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 6/25/2020. (Barletta, Barbara)
June 24, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Stephen A. Sylvia. Responses due by 7/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint)(Simoncelli, Michael)
June 24, 2020 Filing 6 Pro Se Consent to Receive Documents Electronically filed by Stephen A. Sylvia. (Simoncelli, Michael)
June 19, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss in Lieu of Answering Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Steven Calenda. Responses due by 7/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum)(DeSisto, Marc)
June 19, 2020 Notice of Availability to Receive Documents Electronically. Pro Se litigants are encouraged to review the details of the Consent & Registration Form and if interested, complete the Registration Form and return it to the Clerks Office. Click # here to access the form. (Potter, Carrie)
June 19, 2020 Filing 4 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
June 19, 2020 Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
June 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen A. Hilton on behalf of Steven Calenda (Hilton, Kathleen)
June 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc DeSisto on behalf of Steven Calenda (DeSisto, Marc)
June 19, 2020 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2020-04135. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1519959, filed by Steven Calenda. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Notice of Removal - State Court, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(DeSisto, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sylvia v. Calenda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen A. Sylvia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Calenda
Represented By: Marc DeSisto
Represented By: Kathleen A. Hilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?