Laccinole v. Lifespan Corporation
Plaintiff: Christopher Laccinole
Defendant: Lifespan Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv00317
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER finding as moot #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery.. Based on the Court's discussion of the discovery dispute at the pretrial conference, Defendant's motion (ECF 8) to extend time to respond to Plaintiff's combined second set of discovery (interrogatories, document requests and requests to admit) is passed as moot based on Plaintiff's withdrawal of all of the second set of discovery, subject to being propounded hereafter in pertinent part as permitted by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(b)(1), limited to what is proportional to the case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 8/28/2020. (Saucier, Martha)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Factural Discovery to close by 2/26/2021; Plaintiff Expert Disclosures shall be made by 3/12/2021; Defendant Expert Disclosures shall be made by 4/9/2021; Expert Discovery to close by 5/7/2021; Dispositive Motions due 30 days after a decision on any dispositive motions or if no motions are filed by 5/21/2021; Pretrial Memorandum due by 5/28/2021;. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 8/28/2020. (Saucier, Martha)
August 28, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #8 MOTION for an Extension of Time to Complete Discovery referred for determination to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Jackson, Ryan)
August 28, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan: Rule 16 Conference held on 8/28/2020. Christopher Laccinole present as pro se plaintiff; Mark Dolan prsent on behalf of defendant. Court takes up matter of discovery dispute; Court sets scheduling order deadlines. (Video Hearing at 2:00.) (Saucier, Martha)
August 26, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE In Opposition to #8 MOTION for an Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Christopher Laccinole. Replies due by 9/2/2020. (Potter, Carrie)
August 26, 2020 Filing 9 RULE 16 STATEMENT by Christopher Laccinole. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie)
August 18, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for an Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Lifespan Corporation. Responses due by 9/1/2020. (Dolan, Mark)
August 12, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing: VIDEO Rule 16 Conference and Discovery Dispute Conference set for 8/28/2020 at 02:00 PM in Remote Hearing before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. Invitation and instructions have been emailed to both sides. (Saucier, Martha)
August 12, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan to conduct a Rule 16 Conference. (Jackson, Ryan)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the parties are directed to begin their mandatory disclosures immediately, before the Rule 16 conference. To the extent that the parties wish to begin discovery on a cooperative basis prior to the initial conference, they are encouraged to do so. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 7/30/2020. (Jackson, Ryan)
July 24, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lifespan Corporation. (Dolan, Mark)
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Lifespan Corporation.(Dolan, Mark)
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark P. Dolan on behalf of Lifespan Corporation (Dolan, Mark)
July 23, 2020 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Potter, Carrie)
July 22, 2020 Notice of Availability to Receive Documents Electronically. Pro Se litigants are encouraged to review the details of the Consent & Registration Form and if interested, complete the Registration Form and return it to the Clerks Office. Click # here to access the form. (Potter, Carrie)
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
July 22, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington County Superior Court, Case Number WC2020-0270. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1532224, filed by Lifespan Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Notice of Removal (State Court), #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dolan, Mark)
July 22, 2020 Notice of Availability to Receive Documents Electronically. Pro Se litigants are encouraged to review the details of the Consent & Registration Form and if interested, complete the Registration Form and return it to the Clerks Office. Click # here to access the form. (Potter, Carrie)
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
July 22, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington County Superior Court, Case Number WC2020-0270. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1532224, filed by Lifespan Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Notice of Removal (State Court), #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dolan, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laccinole v. Lifespan Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Laccinole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lifespan Corporation
Represented By: Mark P. Dolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?