Alvizures v. Raimondo
Plaintiff: Sara Alvizures
Defendant: Governor Gina Raimondo
Case Number: 1:2020cv00336
Filed: August 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER finding as moot #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 10/1/2020. (Saucier, Martha)
September 30, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Gina Raimondo. (Potter, Carrie)
September 30, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 14670024276 (Hicks, Alyson)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Sara Alvizures. To assure the right of access to the federal court, a plaintiff who lacks the resources to pay the filing fee is entitled to have that and certain other expenses borne as a public expense. 28 U.S.C. 1915. However, before granting a motion to proceed in forma pauperis (IFP), the Court has the unflagging obligation to examine the application and determine whether the plaintiff actually qualifies for IFP status. Temple v. Ellerthorpe, 586 F. Supp. 848, 850 (D.R.I. 1984); Merida v. Nonnenmacher, No. CV 17-465 WES, 2018 WL 2113232, at *2 (D.R.I. May 8, 2018). When a plaintiff is part of a household, the Court must look to the overall household income to make that determination. Christian v. Warwick Realty, LLC, No. CA 14-152 S, 2014 WL 2434626, at *2 (D.R.I. May 29, 2014). In this case, it appears that Plaintiff may well be eligible for IFP status, but the Court lacks the information necessary to make the required determination. Accordingly, Plaintiff is hereby directed to supplement her IFP application under oath with the overall household income available to her for her support. In light of the confidentiality of such information, the Court further orders that Plaintiffs supplemental filing shall be sealed; Plaintiff may seek the assistance of the Clerks Office if she does not know how to make a sealed filing. Alternatively, plaintiff may pay the filing fee. Whichever Plaintiff chooses, either the filing of a sealed supplemental IFP application setting out total household income, or the payment of the filing fee, the Court orders that she must comply within thirty days of this Order. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 8/24/2020. (Saucier, Martha)
August 21, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred for determination to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Jackson, Ryan)
August 11, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Request filed by Sara Alvizures. (McGuire, Vickie)
August 6, 2020 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Sara Alvizures. Regarding New Case: #1 Complaint. (McGuire, Vickie)
August 5, 2020 Notice of Availability to Receive Documents Electronically. Pro Se litigants are encouraged to review the details of the Consent & Registration Form and if interested, complete the Registration Form and return it to the Clerks Office. Click # here to access the form. (McGuire, Vickie)
August 5, 2020 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (McGuire, Vickie)
August 5, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Sara Alvizures. (McGuire, Vickie)
August 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Sara Alvizures. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(McGuire, Vickie) Modified on 8/5/2020 (McGuire, Vickie).This case has been electronically filed and processed, however, after a quality control review the following deficiencies were found: Civil Cover Sheet not attached. The filer is directed to file a Civil Cover Sheet within one day.
August 5, 2020 Notice of Availability to Receive Documents Electronically. Pro Se litigants are encouraged to review the details of the Consent & Registration Form and if interested, complete the Registration Form and return it to the Clerks Office. Click # here to access the form. (McGuire, Vickie)
August 5, 2020 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (McGuire, Vickie)
August 5, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Sara Alvizures. (McGuire, Vickie)
August 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Sara Alvizures. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(McGuire, Vickie) Modified on 8/5/2020 (McGuire, Vickie).This case has been electronically filed and processed, however, after a quality control review the following deficiencies were found: Civil Cover Sheet not attached. The filer is directed to file a Civil Cover Sheet within one day.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alvizures v. Raimondo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Alvizures
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor Gina Raimondo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?