Nina M. v. Saul
Plaintiff: Nina Frances McCarthy
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2020cv00339
Filed: August 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Case reassigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond no longer assigned to the case as the presider. (Noel, Jeannine)
August 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy S. Bolen on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (Bolen, Timothy)
August 10, 2020 NOTICE to Parties of Right to Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Parties who elect to consent must complete the Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form within 14 days. # Please click here to access the form . Consent to Assignment of Magistrate Judge due by 8/24/2020. (Potter, Carrie)
August 10, 2020 Filing 4 SOCIAL SECURITY CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED.The defendant shall have up to and including 10/9/2020 to enter an appearance and either file a dispositive motion or the Certified Administrative Record which shall be deemed an answer (general denial) to the plaintiff's complaint as outlined in Fed. R. Civ. P. 8(b)(3). (Potter, Carrie)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 8/7/2020. (Noel, Jeannine)
August 7, 2020 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
August 7, 2020 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Nina Frances McCarthy. (Salomon, Nora)
August 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA, Waived by Statute, or IFP.), filed by Nina Frances McCarthy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet civil face sheet)(Salomon, Nora)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 8/7/2020. (Noel, Jeannine)
August 7, 2020 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
August 7, 2020 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Nina Frances McCarthy. (Salomon, Nora)
August 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA, Waived by Statute, or IFP.), filed by Nina Frances McCarthy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet civil face sheet)(Salomon, Nora)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nina M. v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Timothy S. Bolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nina Frances McCarthy
Represented By: Nora Salomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?