Albanese v. Blanchette et al
Plaintiff: Wilfred Albanese
Defendant: Edward Blanchette, Central Falls Detention Facility Corporation, Lorraine Cotnoir, Daniel Martin and Ron Labonte
Case Number: 1:2020cv00345
Filed: August 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE In Opposition to #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Wilfred Albanese. Replies due by 10/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Hicks, Alyson)
October 1, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Wilfred Albanese. Responses due by 10/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Hicks, Alyson)
September 30, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Wilfred Albanese. Responses due by 10/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Hicks, Alyson)
September 22, 2020 Filing 12 Letter from Wilfred Albanese. Copy of motion to dismiss sent on 9/22/20. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Hicks, Alyson)
September 22, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Wilfred Albanese. Responses due by 10/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Hicks, Alyson)
September 22, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Issuance of a Summons filed by Wilfred Albanese. Responses due by 10/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Hicks, Alyson)
September 15, 2020 DOCKET NOTE: Regarding: #9 MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply #7 MOTION for Service for Issuance of Summons and Service on Defendant Dr. Edward Blanchette: The document cannot be read as filed. A Clerk's Office member will refile the full documents accordingly. (Potter, Carrie)
September 14, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by Edward Blanchette re #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, WITHDRAWAL (McBurney, Patrick)
September 11, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Responses due by 9/25/2020. (Potter, Carrie)
September 11, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for for Issuance of Summons and Service on Defendant Dr. Edward Blanchette filed by Wilfred Albanese. Responses due by 9/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie) Modified on 9/11/2020 (Potter, Carrie).
August 26, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Withdraw filed by Central Falls Detention Facility Corporation, Lorraine Cotnoir, Ron Labonte, Daniel Martin. Responses due by 9/9/2020. (Reeber, Matthew)
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Central Falls Detention Facility Corporation, Lorraine Cotnoir, Ron Labonte, Daniel Martin. Responses due by 9/8/2020. (Reeber, Matthew)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Central Falls Detention Facility Corporation answer due 8/24/2020; Lorraine Cotnoir answer due 8/24/2020; Ron Labonte answer due 8/24/2020; Daniel Martin answer due 8/24/2020.. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 8/21/2020. (Jackson, Ryan)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (McGuire, Vickie)
August 13, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Central Falls Detention Facility Corporation, Lorraine Cotnoir, Ron Labonte, Daniel Martin. Responses due by 8/27/2020. (Reeber, Matthew)
August 11, 2020 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
August 11, 2020 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
August 11, 2020 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2020-4239. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1538162, filed by Central Falls Detention Facility Corporation, RON LABONTE, LORRAINE COTNOIR, Edward Blanchette, Daniel Martin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Reeber, Matthew)
August 11, 2020 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2020-4239. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1538162, filed by Central Falls Detention Facility Corporation, RON LABONTE, LORRAINE COTNOIR, Edward Blanchette, Daniel Martin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Reeber, Matthew)
August 11, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
August 11, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Albanese v. Blanchette et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Blanchette
Represented By: Patrick J. McBurney
Represented By: Matthew C. Reeber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Falls Detention Facility Corporation
Represented By: Patrick J. McBurney
Represented By: Matthew C. Reeber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorraine Cotnoir
Represented By: Patrick J. McBurney
Represented By: Matthew C. Reeber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Martin
Represented By: Patrick J. McBurney
Represented By: Matthew C. Reeber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Labonte
Represented By: Patrick J. McBurney
Represented By: Matthew C. Reeber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilfred Albanese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?