Key III et al v. Sussex Insurance Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jonathan Key and Hugo Key III
Defendant: Sussex Insurance Company, Inc., Bondex Insurance Company, Dale Group, Inc. doing business as Bondex Program Managers, Clarendon National Insurance Company, Companion Property & Casualty Company and Clarendon National Insurance Company, successor in interest to Sussex Ins. Co.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00347
Filed: August 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond to conduct a Rule 16 Conference. (Jackson, Ryan)
September 14, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sussex Insurance Company, Inc.. (Yagoobian, Christopher)
September 10, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bondex Insurance Company, Dale Group, Inc.. (Schimelman, Benjamin)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Gary A. Strong filed by Benjamin I Schimelman. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 8/25/2020. (McGuire, Vickie)
August 25, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Gary A. Strong to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1542703 ) filed by Bondex Insurance Company. (Schimelman, Benjamin)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the parties are directed to begin their mandatory disclosures immediately, before the Rule 16 conference. To the extent that the parties wish to begin discovery on a cooperative basis prior to the initial conference, they are encouraged to do so. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 8/21/2020. (Jackson, Ryan)
August 19, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin M. Daley on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Daley, Kevin)
August 18, 2020 Filing 8 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Potter, Carrie)
August 13, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Scarlett Rajbanshi on behalf of Sussex Insurance Company, Inc. (Rajbanshi, Scarlett)
August 12, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Bondex Insurance Company, Dale Group, Inc..(Schimelman, Benjamin)
August 12, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by Bondex Insurance Company, Dale Group, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, Amended Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint)(Schimelman, Benjamin)
August 11, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin P. Gavin on behalf of Hugo Key III (Gavin, Kevin)
August 11, 2020 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (McGuire, Vickie)
August 11, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (McGuire, Vickie)
August 11, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J. Yagoobian on behalf of Sussex Insurance Company, Inc. (Yagoobian, Christopher)
August 11, 2020 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington County Superior Court, Case Number WC-2020-0086. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1538435, filed by Bondex Insurance Company, Dale Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #4 Civil Cover Sheet (with attachment))(Schimelman, Benjamin)
August 11, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin P. Gavin on behalf of Hugo Key III (Gavin, Kevin)
August 11, 2020 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (McGuire, Vickie)
August 11, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (McGuire, Vickie)
August 11, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J. Yagoobian on behalf of Sussex Insurance Company, Inc. (Yagoobian, Christopher)
August 11, 2020 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington County Superior Court, Case Number WC-2020-0086. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1538435, filed by Bondex Insurance Company, Dale Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #4 Civil Cover Sheet (with attachment))(Schimelman, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Key III et al v. Sussex Insurance Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sussex Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J. Yagoobian
Represented By: Scarlett Rajbanshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bondex Insurance Company
Represented By: Benjamin I Schimelman
Represented By: Gary A. Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Group, Inc. doing business as Bondex Program Managers
Represented By: Benjamin I Schimelman
Represented By: Gary A. Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarendon National Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher J. Yagoobian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Companion Property & Casualty Company
Represented By: Christopher J. Yagoobian
Represented By: Scarlett Rajbanshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarendon National Insurance Company, successor in interest to Sussex Ins. Co.
Represented By: Christopher J. Yagoobian
Represented By: Scarlett Rajbanshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Key
Represented By: Kevin P. Gavin
Represented By: Kevin M. Daley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hugo Key III
Represented By: Kevin P. Gavin
Represented By: Kevin M. Daley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?