Ponte Investments, LLC v. K BAR T Custom Homes Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ponte Investments, LLC
Defendant: Kerry M. Carroll, K BAR T Custom Homes Inc. and Independence Title
Case Number: 1:2020cv00357
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 JUDGMENT in favor of Ponte Investments, LLC against K BAR T Custom Homes Inc., Kerry M. Carroll- So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 9/29/2020. (Barletta, Barbara)
September 29, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE by Ponte Investments, LLC Judgment (Mulhearn, Christopher)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting as unopposed #12 Motion to Enforce Judgment- So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 9/29/2020. (Barletta, Barbara)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #11 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice as to Independence Title- So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 9/15/2020. (Barletta, Barbara)
September 14, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Enforce Judgment as against Defendants filed by Ponte Investments, LLC. Responses due by 9/28/2020. (Mulhearn, Christopher)
September 11, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE by Ponte Investments, LLC of Voluntary Dismissal (Mulhearn, Christopher)
September 11, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ponte Investments, LLC. Independence Title served on 9/2/2020, answer due 9/23/2020. (Mulhearn, Christopher)
September 9, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ponte Investments, LLC. Kerry M. Carroll served on 9/1/2020, answer due 9/22/2020. (Mulhearn, Christopher)
September 9, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ponte Investments, LLC. K BAR T Custom Homes Inc. served on 9/1/2020, answer due 9/22/2020. (Mulhearn, Christopher)
August 25, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Potter, Carrie)
August 25, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Request filed by Ponte Investments, LLC. (Mulhearn, Christopher)
August 25, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Request filed by Ponte Investments, LLC. (Mulhearn, Christopher)
August 25, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Request filed by Ponte Investments, LLC. (Mulhearn, Christopher)
August 25, 2020 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Kerry M. Carroll, Independence Title, K BAR T Custom Homes Inc., filed by Ponte Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits)(Mulhearn, Christopher)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
August 17, 2020 Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1540179 ), filed by Ponte Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mulhearn, Christopher)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
August 17, 2020 Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1540179 ), filed by Ponte Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mulhearn, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ponte Investments, LLC v. K BAR T Custom Homes Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kerry M. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K BAR T Custom Homes Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Independence Title
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ponte Investments, LLC
Represented By: Christopher M. Mulhearn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?