4M Building Solutions, Inc. v. Island Health and Rehab LLC et al
Plaintiff: 4M Building Solutions, Inc.
Defendant: Island Health and Rehab LLC and 100 Wampanoag Trail Operating Company LLC doing business as Elderwood at Riverside
Cross Claimant: 100 Wampanoag Trail Operating Company LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00377
Filed: August 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Island Health and Rehab LLC by 100 Wampanoag Trail Operating Company LLC.(Cavanagh, Joseph)
October 21, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Island Health and Rehab LLC. Responses due by 11/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum of Law for Island Health and Rehab LLC's Motion to Dismiss)(Lumley, Richard)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #11 Stipulation to extend time to respond; Reset Deadlines: 100 Wampanoag Trail Operating Company LLC answer due 10/21/2020 - So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 10/9/2020. (Barletta, Barbara)
October 8, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer Complaint (10-21-20) filed by 100 Wampanoag Trail Operating Company LLC. (Cavanagh, Joseph)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #10 Stipulation to extend time to answer; Reset Deadlines: 100 Wampanoag Trail Operating Company LLC answer due 10/14/2020 -- So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 9/17/2020. (Barletta, Barbara)
September 16, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (10-14-20) filed by 100 Wampanoag Trail Operating Company LLC. (Cavanagh, Joseph)
September 16, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph V. Cavanagh, III on behalf of 100 Wampanoag Trail Operating Company LLC (Cavanagh, Joseph)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to answer; Reset Deadlines: Island Health and Rehab LLC answer due 10/21/2020- So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 9/16/2020. (Barletta, Barbara)
September 15, 2020 Filing 8 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time Until October 21, 2020 to Respond to Complaint filed by Island Health and Rehab LLC. Responses due by 9/29/2020. (Lumley, Richard)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Shepard Davidson filed by Richard Lumley. - So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 9/11/2020. (McGuire, Vickie)
September 11, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Shepard Davidson to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1548135 ) filed by Island Health and Rehab LLC. (Lumley, Richard)
September 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Lumley on behalf of Island Health and Rehab LLC (Lumley, Richard)
September 8, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 4M Building Solutions, Inc.. 100 Wampanoag Trail Operating Company LLC served on 8/31/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. (Cavazza, Timothy)
September 8, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 4M Building Solutions, Inc.. Island Health and Rehab LLC served on 8/31/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. (Cavazza, Timothy)
August 28, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Potter, Carrie)
August 28, 2020 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
August 28, 2020 Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
August 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1544022 ), filed by 4M Building Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Island Health and Rehab LLC, #3 Summons - 100 Wampanoag)(Cavazza, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 4M Building Solutions, Inc. v. Island Health and Rehab LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Island Health and Rehab LLC
Represented By: Shepard Davidson
Represented By: Richard Lumley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 100 Wampanoag Trail Operating Company LLC doing business as Elderwood at Riverside
Represented By: Joseph V. Cavanagh, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 4M Building Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy K. Baldwin
Represented By: Timothy C. Cavazza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: 100 Wampanoag Trail Operating Company LLC
Represented By: Joseph V. Cavanagh, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?