Young v. C R Bard Inc et al
Plaintiff: Donald Young
Defendant: Does 1 through 100 Inclusive, McKesson Corporation, C R Bard Inc and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00382
Filed: September 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearances (Potter, Carrie)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER denying without prejudice to refiling #2 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction after the stay period in this matter, if necessary. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 9/18/2020. (Jackson, Ryan)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER finding as moot #8 Motion to Dismiss pursuant to the entry of the #31 Stipulation to Dismiss Claims Against McKesson Corporation Without Prejudice. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 9/18/2020. (Jackson, Ryan)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entering #31 Stipulation to Dismiss Claims Against McKesson Corporation Without Prejudice. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 9/18/2020. (Jackson, Ryan)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #32 Motion to Stay discovery and all other Pretrial Deadlines for 90 days, or up to and including 12/18/2020. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 9/18/2020. (Jackson, Ryan)
September 16, 2020 Filing 32 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery and All Pretrial Deadlines filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Inc. Responses due by 9/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proposed Order)(Uiterwyk, Patrick)
September 16, 2020 Filing 31 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Claims Against McKesson Corporation Without Prejudice filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation. (Uiterwyk, Patrick)
September 8, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick T. Uiterwyk on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation (Uiterwyk, Patrick)
September 4, 2020 Filing 29 Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:20-cv-02603. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Pursuant to LR Gen 201(b)(5), counsel who is a member in good standing of the bar of another federal district court is exempt from the requirements of bar membership, and may appear and practice in this Court for this case. Counsel is directed to register as an ECF Filing User in accordance with LR Gen 304(a) by completing the ECF Registration Form located under the CM/ECF Quick Link from our website. #http://www.rid.uscourts.gov
September 4, 2020 Filing 29 Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:20-cv-02603. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Pursuant to LR Gen 201(b)(5), counsel who is a member in good standing of the bar of another federal district court is exempt from the requirements of bar membership, and may appear and practice in this Court for this case. Counsel is directed to register as an ECF Filing User in accordance with LR Gen 304(a) by completing the ECF Registration Form located under the CM/ECF Quick Link from our website. #http://www.rid.uscourts.gov
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting #22 Unopposed Motion to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out-of-State Plaintiffs' Cases. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to sever and transfer this action as follows: a. Plaintiff Ronald Clemons's case be severed and transferred to the Kansas City Division of the District of Kansas (Civil case 3:20-cv-2596-S opened); b. Plaintiff Alan Frailich's case be severed and transferred to the Las Vegas Division of the District of Nevada (Civil case 3:20-cv-2597-S opened); c. Plaintiff Leroy Moton's case be severed and transferred to the Manhattan Division of the Southern District of New York (Civil case 3:20-cv-2598-S opened); d. Plaintiff Ida Napolitano's case be severed and transferred to the New Haven Division of the District of Connecticut (Civil case 3:20-cv-2599-S opened); e. Plaintiff Nancy Poff's case be severed and transferred to the Durham Division of the Middle District of North Carolina (Civil case 3:20-cv-2600-S opened); f. Plaintiff Jamaun Ransom's case be severed and transferred to the Lexington Division of the Eastern District of Kentucky (Civil case 3:20-cv-2601-S opened); g. Plaintiff Jerry Watkins's case be severed and transferred to the Lexington Division of the Eastern District of Kentucky (Civil case 3:20-cv-2602-S opened); andh. Plaintiff Donald Young's case be severed and transferred to the District of Rhode Island (Civil case 3:20-cv-2603-S opened). Plaintiff Brenda Shaffer is the sole plaintiff with any connection to this forum. Accordingly, she shall remain in the Dallas Division of the Northern District of Texas. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/31/2020) (axm)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Dismissing Parties. Party Cheryl Jones-Latimer terminated. The parties shall bear their own costs. All relief not expressly granted is DENIED. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/25/2020) (oyh)
August 24, 2020 Filing 26 Supplemental RESPONSE filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc re: #22 Amended MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Matthews, Melissa) Modified title on 8/25/2020 (awc).
August 14, 2020 Filing 25 RESPONSE filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc re: #22 Amended MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases, #19 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division (Matthews, Melissa)
August 13, 2020 Filing 24 Appendix in Support filed by Ronald Clemons, Alan Frailich, Cheryl Jones-Latimer, Leroy Moton, Ida Napolitano, Nancy Poff, Jamaun Ransom, Brenda Shaffer, Jerry Watkins, Donald Young re #22 Amended MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Schulte, Steven)
August 13, 2020 Filing 23 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Ronald Clemons, Alan Frailich, Cheryl Jones-Latimer, Leroy Moton, Ida Napolitano, Nancy Poff, Jamaun Ransom, Brenda Shaffer, Jerry Watkins, Donald Young re #22 Amended MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Schulte, Steven)
August 13, 2020 Filing 22 Amended MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases filed by Ronald Clemons, Alan Frailich, Cheryl Jones-Latimer, Leroy Moton, Ida Napolitano, Nancy Poff, Jamaun Ransom, Brenda Shaffer, Jerry Watkins, Donald Young (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Schulte, Steven)
August 3, 2020 Filing 21 Appendix in Support filed by Ronald Clemons, Alan Frailich, Cheryl Jones-Latimer, Leroy Moton, Ida Napolitano, Nancy Poff, Jamaun Ransom, Brenda Shaffer, Jerry Watkins, Donald Young re #19 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Schulte, Steven)
August 3, 2020 Filing 20 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Ronald Clemons, Alan Frailich, Cheryl Jones-Latimer, Leroy Moton, Ida Napolitano, Nancy Poff, Jamaun Ransom, Brenda Shaffer, Jerry Watkins, Donald Young re #19 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Schulte, Steven)
August 3, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases filed by Ronald Clemons, Alan Frailich, Cheryl Jones-Latimer, Leroy Moton, Ida Napolitano, Nancy Poff, Jamaun Ransom, Brenda Shaffer, Jerry Watkins, Donald Young (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Schulte, Steven).
August 3, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE filed by Ronald Clemons, Alan Frailich, Cheryl Jones-Latimer, Leroy Moton, Ida Napolitano, Nancy Poff, Jamaun Ransom, Brenda Shaffer, Jerry Watkins, Donald Young re: #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Schulte, Steven)
July 22, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms for Each Plaintiff re: #15 Order, filed by Ronald Clemons, Alan Frailich, Cheryl Jones-Latimer, Leroy Moton, Ida Napolitano, Nancy Poff, Jamaun Ransom, Brenda Shaffer, Jerry Watkins, Donald Young (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Completed Plaintiff Forms) (Schulte, Steven)
July 21, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms for Each Plaintiff filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Responses) (Matthews, Melissa)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: To assist the Court, counsel for all parties shall complete the form attached hereto as Exhibit A for each Plaintiff in this action. The parties shall file their completed forms on or before 7/22/2020. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/16/2020) (oyh)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court grants the parties' Agreed Motion for Extension of Time. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/1/2020) (ctf)
June 29, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #8 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Ronald Clemons, Alan Frailich, Cheryl Jones-Latimer, Leroy Moton, Ida Napolitano, Nancy Poff, Jamaun Ransom, Brenda Shaffer, Jerry Watkins, Donald Young (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Schulte, Steven)
June 19, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corporation. (Matthews, Melissa) (Main Document 12 replaced with the flattened document on 6/23/2020) (pnp).
June 19, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by McKesson Corporation (Matthews, Melissa)
June 19, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Matthews, Melissa)
June 19, 2020 Filing 9 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by McKesson Corporation re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Matthews, Melissa)
June 19, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by McKesson Corporation (Matthews, Melissa)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This case is TRANSFERRED to the docket of the Honorable Karen Gren Scholer. Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 6/15/2020) (twd)
June 12, 2020 Filing 6 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml)
June 12, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.. (Matthews, Melissa)
June 12, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by C. R. Bard, Inc.. (Matthews, Melissa)
June 12, 2020 Filing 3 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Inc. re #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Matthews, Melissa)
June 12, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Inc. (Matthews, Melissa)
June 12, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by C. R. Bard, Inc., Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10913348) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s) A - Portion of REACH Agreement, #4 Exhibit(s) B - McKesson Corporation, #5 Exhibit(s) C - 8-30-16 Romney, Kim Deposition, #6 Exhibit(s) D - Index of State Court Documents, #7 Exhibit(s) D-1 - State Court Docket Sheet, #8 Exhibit(s) D-2 - Plaintiffs' Original Petition, #9 Exhibit(s) D-3 - Civil Case Info Sheet, #10 Exhibit(s) D-4 - Citation Issued to C.R. Bard, Inc., #11 Exhibit(s) D-5 - Citation Issued to Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., #12 Exhibit(s) D-6 - Citation Issued to McKesson Corp., #13 Exhibit(s) D-7 - Affidavit of Service - McKesson, #14 Exhibit(s) D-8 - Return of Service - C.R. Bard, Inc., #15 Exhibit(s) D-9 - Return of Service - Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.) (Matthews, Melissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. C R Bard Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E Jarreau
Represented By: Patrick T. Uiterwyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Inc
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E Jarreau
Represented By: Patrick T. Uiterwyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E Jarreau
Represented By: Patrick T. Uiterwyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Young
Represented By: Darren McDowell
Represented By: Eric Martin Przybysz
Represented By: Steven Scott Schulte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?