Raposa v. Carberry et al
Plaintiff: Lisa M. Raposa
Defendant: Cassandra L. Carberry and Women & Infants Hospital of Rhode Island
Case Number: 1:2020cv00434
Filed: October 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Factual Discovery to close by 9/1/2021; Plaintiff's Expert Disclosures shall be made by 10/1/2021; Defendants' Expert Disclosures shall be made by 11/1/2021; Expert Discovery to close by 12/1/2021 and Dispositive Motions shall be filed by 1/2/2022 - So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 11/30/2020. (Barletta, Barbara)
November 30, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference held on 11/30/2020; Timothy Grimes, Patrick Barry and Joshua Carlin participated (Barletta, Barbara)
November 25, 2020 Filing 12 RULE 16 STATEMENT by Lisa M. Raposa. (Grimes, Timothy)
November 25, 2020 Filing 11 RULE 16 STATEMENT by All Defendants. (Carlin, Joshua)
November 13, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for Monday, 11/30/2020 at 09:00 AM before Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. Call in instructions will be provided to counsel of record prior to the conference (Barletta, Barbara)
October 28, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lisa M. Raposa. Women & Infants Hospital of Rhode Island served on 10/20/2020, answer due 11/10/2020. (Barry, Patrick)
October 28, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lisa M. Raposa. Cassandra L. Carberry served on 10/20/2020, answer due 11/10/2020. (Barry, Patrick)
October 22, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Cassandra L. Carberry.(Carlin, Joshua)
October 22, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua E. Carlin on behalf of Cassandra L. Carberry (Carlin, Joshua)
October 22, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Women & Infants Hospital of Rhode Island.(Carlin, Joshua)
October 22, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua E. Carlin on behalf of Women & Infants Hospital of Rhode Island (Carlin, Joshua)
October 7, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Cassandra L. Carberry, Women & Infants Hospital of Rhode Island. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Hicks, Alyson)
October 7, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Cassandra L. Carberry, Women & Infants Hospital of Rhode Island. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Hicks, Alyson)
October 7, 2020 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
October 7, 2020 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
October 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1556484 ), filed by Lisa M. Raposa. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Barry, Patrick)
October 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1556484 ), filed by Lisa M. Raposa. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Barry, Patrick)
October 7, 2020 Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hicks, Alyson)
October 7, 2020 Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hicks, Alyson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raposa v. Carberry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cassandra L. Carberry
Represented By: Joshua E. Carlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Women & Infants Hospital of Rhode Island
Represented By: Joshua E. Carlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa M. Raposa
Represented By: Patrick C. Barry
Represented By: Timothy J. Grimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?