Moore et al v. Crane Co. et al
Plaintiff: Rose Moore and Michael J. Moore
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Corp., VIMASCO Corporation, Electric Boat Corporation doing business as General Dynamics Electric Boat, Niantic Seal, Inc., Packing & Insulation Corporation, Taco, Inc., Crane Co., Melrath Gasket, Inc., P.I.C. Contractors, Inc. and Eckel Industries, Inc.
Cross Defendant: Electric Boat Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv00466
Filed: October 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion to Withdraw and withdrawing without prejudice #11 Motion to Remand to State Court; Certified copy of order sent to the Clerk of Court for the state court in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1447(c) - So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 12/14/2020. (Barletta, Barbara)
December 11, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Withdraw #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 12/28/2020. (Deaton, John)
December 2, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 12/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Deaton, John)
November 13, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crane Co.. (Goldman, David) (Main Document 10 replaced on 11/13/2020) (Smith, Rana).
November 13, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Goldman on behalf of Crane Co. (Goldman, David) (Main Document 9 replaced on 11/13/2020) (Smith, Rana).
November 10, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Eckel Industries, Inc.. (Bergeron, Kendra)
November 10, 2020 Filing 7 Eckel Industries ANSWER to Complaint and, First CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Eckel Industries, Inc..(Bergeron, Kendra)
November 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kendra A. Bergeron on behalf of Eckel Industries, Inc. (Bergeron, Kendra)
November 3, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Crane Co., Eckel Industries, Inc., Foster Wheeler Energy Corp., Melrath Gasket, Inc., Niantic Seal, Inc., P.I.C. Contractors, Inc., Packing & Insulation Corporation, Taco, Inc., VIMASCO Corporation by Electric Boat Corporation.(Weisberg, Zachary)
November 2, 2020 Filing 4 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Simoncelli, Michael)
October 30, 2020 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
October 30, 2020 Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
October 30, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Electric Boat Corporation d/b/a General Dynamics Electric Boat identifying Corporate Parent General Dynamics Corporation for Electric Boat Corporation d/b/a General Dynamics Electric Boat.. (Weisberg, Zachary)
October 30, 2020 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2020-06715. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1564142, filed by Electric Boat Corporation d/b/a General Dynamics Electric Boat. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Copy of Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit A-E, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Weisberg, Zachary)
October 30, 2020 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
October 30, 2020 Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
October 30, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Electric Boat Corporation d/b/a General Dynamics Electric Boat identifying Corporate Parent General Dynamics Corporation for Electric Boat Corporation d/b/a General Dynamics Electric Boat.. (Weisberg, Zachary)
October 30, 2020 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2020-06715. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1564142, filed by Electric Boat Corporation d/b/a General Dynamics Electric Boat. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Copy of Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit A-E, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Weisberg, Zachary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore et al v. Crane Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIMASCO Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electric Boat Corporation doing business as General Dynamics Electric Boat
Represented By: Zachary M. Weisberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Niantic Seal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Packing & Insulation Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Represented By: Eric J. Robbie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melrath Gasket, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.I.C. Contractors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eckel Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Kendra A. Bergeron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Moore
Represented By: John E. Deaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J. Moore
Represented By: John E. Deaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Electric Boat Corporation
Represented By: Zachary M. Weisberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?