Laccinole v. Lifespan Corporation
Plaintiff: Christopher Laccinole
Defendant: Lifespan Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv00468
Filed: November 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: Mary S McElroy
2 Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE In Opposition to #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court with Supporting Memo filed by All Defendants. Replies due by 12/29/2020. (Dolan, Mark)
December 8, 2020 Filing 7 RULE 16 STATEMENT by Christopher Laccinole. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Hicks, Alyson)
December 8, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court with Supporting Memo filed by Christopher Laccinole. Responses due by 12/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum)(Hicks, Alyson)
December 1, 2020 Case reassigned to District Judge William E. Smith. District Judge Mary S. McElroy no longer assigned to the case. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
December 1, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Mary S. McElroy: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference held on 12/1/2020. Christopher Laccinole and Mark P. Dolan participated. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
November 9, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Remote Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for 12/1/2020 at 10:30 AM before District Judge Mary S. McElroy. The Court will send call in information to all parites by mail and/or email. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
November 4, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Lifespan Corporation.(Dolan, Mark)
November 4, 2020 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Hicks, Alyson)
November 2, 2020 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
November 2, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hicks, Alyson)
November 2, 2020 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington County District Court, Case Number 4CA-2020-00819. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1564538, filed by Lifespan Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Complaint (4th Division), #2 Notice of Filing, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dolan, Mark)
November 2, 2020 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
November 2, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hicks, Alyson)
November 2, 2020 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington County District Court, Case Number 4CA-2020-00819. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1564538, filed by Lifespan Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Complaint (4th Division), #2 Notice of Filing, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dolan, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laccinole v. Lifespan Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Laccinole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lifespan Corporation
Represented By: Mark P. Dolan
Represented By: Mark P. Dolan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?