Lemire v. State of Rhode Island
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Edward Lemire
Defendant: State of Rhode Island
Case Number: 1:2020cv00481
Filed: November 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER adopting #4 Report and Recommendations; granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and dismissing #1 Complaint with prejudice - So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 12/28/2020. (Barletta, Barbara)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION FOR SUMMARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1915(e) and ORDER - Plaintiff's Motions to Proceed IFP (ECF No. 2) is GRANTED. However, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B), I further recommend that Plaintiff's Complaint (ECF No. 1) and this case be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jeffrey Edward Lemire, REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint filed by Jeffrey Edward Lemire ( Objections to R&R due by 12/22/2020.) So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 12/8/2020. (Noel, Jeannine)
November 16, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred for determination to Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Barletta, Barbara)
November 13, 2020 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (McGuire, Vickie)
November 13, 2020 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (McGuire, Vickie)
November 13, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jeffrey Edward Lemire. (McGuire, Vickie)
November 13, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jeffrey Edward Lemire. (McGuire, Vickie)
November 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Jeffrey Edward Lemire. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(McGuire, Vickie)
November 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Jeffrey Edward Lemire. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(McGuire, Vickie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lemire v. State of Rhode Island
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Edward Lemire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Rhode Island
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?