Derrick v. City of East Providence
Plaintiff: Colleen A. Derrick
Defendant: City of East Providence
Case Number: 1:2020cv00491
Filed: November 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Mary S McElroy
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Acceptance of Service filed by Colleen A. Derrick. City of East Providence served on 1/8/2021, answer due 3/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit A - Summons)(Sinapi, Richard)
December 2, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Chloe A. Davis on behalf of Colleen A. Derrick (Davis, Chloe)
November 20, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to City of East Providence. (Simoncelli, Michael)
November 20, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to City of East Providence. (Simoncelli, Michael)
November 20, 2020 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Simoncelli, Michael)
November 20, 2020 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Simoncelli, Michael)
November 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1570583 ), filed by Colleen A. Derrick. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Sinapi, Richard)
November 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1570583 ), filed by Colleen A. Derrick. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Sinapi, Richard)
November 20, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Simoncelli, Michael)
November 20, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Simoncelli, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Derrick v. City of East Providence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of East Providence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colleen A. Derrick
Represented By: Chloe A. Davis
Represented By: Richard A. Sinapi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?