Avallon v. City of Newport et al
Plaintiff: Kimberly Avallon
Defendant: Eric Adkins, Ian McGregor and City of Newport
Case Number: 1:2020cv00515
Filed: December 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER entered referring case to Mediation pursuant to this Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution Plan to be scheduled in late-November 2021. Information about the Plan can be found by clicking #here. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 1/28/2021. (Jackson, Ryan)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Factual Discovery to be completed by 7/26/2021; Plaintiff Expert Disclosures shall be made by 8/27/2021; Defendant Expert Disclosures shall be made by 9/27/2021; All Expert Discovery to be completed by 10/27/2021; Dispositive Motions to be filed by 11/26/2021; Pretrial Memorandum due 30 days after decision on any pending motions, or if no motions are pending, by 11/26/2021. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 1/28/2021. (Jackson, Ryan)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge William E. Smith: Rule 16 Conference via Zoom held on 1/26/2021: counsel present: M. Garland; M. DeSisto. (Jackson, Ryan)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Garland, Michael)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Conference via Zoom scheduled for Tuesday 1/26/2021 at 10:00 AM as a Remote Hearing before District Judge William E. Smith.(Zoom Meeting ID: 161 918 6057, Passcode: 435298) (Jackson, Ryan)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the parties are directed to begin their mandatory disclosures immediately, before the Rule 16 conference. To the extent that the parties wish to begin discovery on a cooperative basis prior to the initial conference, they are encouraged to do so. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 12/22/2020. (Jackson, Ryan)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W. Garland on behalf of Kimberly Avallon (Garland, Michael)
December 9, 2020 Filing 4 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Eric Adkins, City of Newport, Ian McGregor.(DeSisto, Marc)
December 9, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Eric Adkins, City of Newport, Ian McGregor.(DeSisto, Marc)
December 9, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc DeSisto on behalf of All Defendants (DeSisto, Marc)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc DeSisto on behalf of All Defendants (DeSisto, Marc)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Newport County Superior Court, Case Number nc-2019-0291. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0103-1575584, filed by Ian McGregor, Eric Adkins, City of Newport. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Notice of Removal - State Court, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(DeSisto, Marc)
December 9, 2020 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Newport County Superior Court, Case Number nc-2019-0291. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0103-1575584, filed by Ian McGregor, Eric Adkins, City of Newport. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Notice of Removal - State Court, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(DeSisto, Marc)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hicks, Alyson)
December 9, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hicks, Alyson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Avallon v. City of Newport et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Adkins
Represented By: Marc DeSisto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ian McGregor
Represented By: Marc DeSisto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Newport
Represented By: Marc DeSisto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Avallon
Represented By: Michael W. Garland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?