Williams v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Maria Williams
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 1:2020cv00544
Filed: December 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: Mary S McElroy
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Andrew J. Feldman to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1592263 ) filed by Maria Williams. (Breggia, Stephen)
February 10, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Jacob A. Flint to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1592255 ) filed by Maria Williams. (Breggia, Stephen)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jacob A. Flint filed by Stephen E. Breggia and granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Andrew J. Feldman filed by Stephen E. Breggia. - So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 2/10/2021. (McGuire, Vickie)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Ethicon, Inc. answer due 3/12/2021; Johnson & Johnson answer due 3/12/2021 - So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 1/27/2021. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
January 26, 2021 Filing 6 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, ASSENTED-TO MOTION TO EXTEND THE DEADLINE FOR FILING A RESPONSIVE PLEADING filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. Responses due by 2/9/2021. (Guilfoyle, Kathleen)
January 26, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Guilfoyle, Kathleen)
January 26, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen M. Guilfoyle on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Guilfoyle, Kathleen)
December 30, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Hicks, Alyson)
December 30, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Hicks, Alyson)
December 30, 2020 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
December 30, 2020 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
December 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number 0103-1580604 ), filed by Maria Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons-Johnson & Johnson, #3 Summons-Ethicon, Inc.)(Breggia, Stephen) (Attachment 1 replaced with flattened version on 12/30/2020) (Hicks, Alyson).
December 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number 0103-1580604 ), filed by Maria Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons-Johnson & Johnson, #3 Summons-Ethicon, Inc.)(Breggia, Stephen) (Attachment 1 replaced with flattened version on 12/30/2020) (Hicks, Alyson).
December 30, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hicks, Alyson)
December 30, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hicks, Alyson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc.
Represented By: Kathleen M. Guilfoyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Kathleen M. Guilfoyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Williams
Represented By: Stephen E. Breggia
Represented By: Andrew J. Feldman
Represented By: Jacob A. Flint
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?