Loftus, et al v. Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Brenda Reges, Brian Loftus, Ana L. Nelson and Sarah Wilding
Defendant: John Doe Companies 1 through 10 and Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00012
Filed: January 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: Mary S McElroy
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #12 Notice of Stipulation of Dismissal - So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 2/18/2021. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
February 8, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE by Brian Loftus, Ana L. Nelson, Brenda Reges, Sarah Wilding of Dismissal (Formisano, V.)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Reset Deadlines: Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc. answer due 2/19/2021 - So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 1/27/2021. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
January 22, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN COLLECTIVE ACTION by Brenda Reges (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Formisano, V.)
January 22, 2021 Filing 10 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint,, (to 2/19/21) filed by Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc.. Responses due by 2/5/2021. (Persky, Jonathan)
January 22, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc. for Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc... (Persky, Jonathan)
January 22, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan D. Persky on behalf of Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc. (Persky, Jonathan)
January 21, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN COLLECTIVE ACTION by Brian Loftus (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Formisano, V.)
January 19, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN COLLECTIVE ACTION by Ana L. Nelson, Sarah Wilding (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join)(Formisano, V.)
January 8, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sarah Wilding, Brian Loftus, Brenda Reges, Ana L. Nelson. Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc. served on 1/8/2021, answer due 1/29/2021. (Formisano, V.)
January 7, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc.. (Hicks, Alyson)
January 7, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc.. (Hicks, Alyson)
January 7, 2021 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
January 7, 2021 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
January 7, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Request filed by Brian Loftus, individually and on behalf of a class of persons similarly situated, Ana L. Nelson, individually and on behalf of a class of persons similarly situated, Brenda Reges, individually and on behalf of a class of persons similarly situated, Sarah Wilding, individually and on behalf of a class of persons similarly situated. (Formisano, V.)
January 7, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Request filed by Brian Loftus, individually and on behalf of a class of persons similarly situated, Ana L. Nelson, individually and on behalf of a class of persons similarly situated, Brenda Reges, individually and on behalf of a class of persons similarly situated, Sarah Wilding, individually and on behalf of a class of persons similarly situated. (Formisano, V.)
January 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number 0103-1582140 ), filed by Sarah Wilding, individually and on behalf of a class of persons similarly situated, Brian Loftus, individually and on behalf of a class of persons similarly situated, Brenda Reges, individually and on behalf of a class of persons similarly situated, Ana L. Nelson, individually and on behalf of a class of persons similarly situated. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Formisano, V.) (Attachment 1 replaced with flattened version on 1/7/2021) (Hicks, Alyson).
January 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number 0103-1582140 ), filed by Sarah Wilding, individually and on behalf of a class of persons similarly situated, Brian Loftus, individually and on behalf of a class of persons similarly situated, Brenda Reges, individually and on behalf of a class of persons similarly situated, Ana L. Nelson, individually and on behalf of a class of persons similarly situated. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Formisano, V.) (Attachment 1 replaced with flattened version on 1/7/2021) (Hicks, Alyson).
January 7, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hicks, Alyson)
January 7, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hicks, Alyson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loftus, et al v. Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Reges
Represented By: V. Edward Formisano
Represented By: Michael D. Pushee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Loftus
Represented By: V. Edward Formisano
Represented By: Michael D. Pushee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana L. Nelson
Represented By: V. Edward Formisano
Represented By: Michael D. Pushee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Wilding
Represented By: V. Edward Formisano
Represented By: Michael D. Pushee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Companies 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan D. Persky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?