Sarwar v. Mukteshwar, LLC
Plaintiff: Saim Sarwar
Defendant: Mukteshwar, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00015
Filed: January 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: Mary S McElroy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by Saim Sarwar Mukteshwar, LLC served on 1/19/2021, answer due 2/9/2021. (Ruggiero, Daniel)
January 11, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Mukteshwar, LLC. (Hicks, Alyson)
January 11, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Request filed by Saim Sarwar. (Ruggiero, Daniel)
January 7, 2021 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
January 7, 2021 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
January 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number 0103-1582378 ), filed by Saim Sarwar. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Ruggiero, Daniel)
January 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number 0103-1582378 ), filed by Saim Sarwar. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Ruggiero, Daniel)
January 7, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
January 7, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sarwar v. Mukteshwar, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mukteshwar, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saim Sarwar
Represented By: Daniel G. Ruggiero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?