FTGU Investment Group, LLC v. Secretary of Housing and Urban Development
Plaintiff: FTGU Investment Group, LLC
Defendant: Secretary of Housing and Urban Development
Case Number: 1:2021cv00023
Filed: January 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2021 HEARING CANCELLED: The telephonic rule 16 conference scheduled for Wednesday, 2/24/21 at 9:30 a.m. before Judge McConnell is cancelled (Barletta, Barbara)
February 2, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for Wednesday, 2/24/2021 at 09:30 AM before Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.; Call in instructions will be provided to counsel of record prior to the conference (Barletta, Barbara)
January 28, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Secretary of Housing and Urban Development.(Rogers, Mary)
January 15, 2021 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (McGuire, Vickie)
January 14, 2021 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
January 14, 2021 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
January 14, 2021 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PM-2020-8302. (No fee paid, USA, Waived by Statute,or IFP.), filed by Mary Rogers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rogers, Mary) (Attachment 2 replaced with flattened version on 1/14/2021) (Hicks, Alyson).
January 14, 2021 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PM-2020-8302. (No fee paid, USA, Waived by Statute,or IFP.), filed by Mary Rogers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rogers, Mary) (Attachment 2 replaced with flattened version on 1/14/2021) (Hicks, Alyson).
January 14, 2021 Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Hicks, Alyson)
January 14, 2021 Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Hicks, Alyson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FTGU Investment Group, LLC v. Secretary of Housing and Urban Development
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FTGU Investment Group, LLC
Represented By: Fernando S. Cunha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of Housing and Urban Development
Represented By: Mary Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?