Fausto G. v. Saul
Plaintiff: Fausto Medina Guity
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2021cv00034
Filed: January 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2021 Case reassigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan no longer assigned to the case as presider. (Saucier, Martha)
March 17, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole J. Sonia on behalf of Andrew M Saul (Sonia, Nicole)
January 19, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment of Case to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. Within 14 days of receipt of this notice, parties must either consent or decline to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction by completing a Consent/Declination form. # Please click here to access the form . Consent to Assignment of Magistrate Judge due by 2/2/2021. Consent to Assignment of Magistrate Judge due by 2/2/2021. (Hicks, Alyson)
January 19, 2021 Filing 3 SOCIAL SECURITY CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED.# Personal Identifier Statement due 1/20/2021. (Hicks, Alyson)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 1/19/2021. (Saucier, Martha)
January 19, 2021 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Hicks, Alyson)
January 18, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Fausto Medina Guity. (Maguire, Stephen)
January 18, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Fausto Medina Guity. (Maguire, Stephen)
January 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA, Waived by Statute, or IFP.), filed by Fausto Medina Guity. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons.GenCounsel, #3 Summons.Rosen, #4 Summons.Saul, #5 Summons.Weisman)(Maguire, Stephen)
January 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA, Waived by Statute, or IFP.), filed by Fausto Medina Guity. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons.GenCounsel, #3 Summons.Rosen, #4 Summons.Saul, #5 Summons.Weisman)(Maguire, Stephen) (Attachment 1 replaced with flattened version on 1/19/2021) (Hicks, Alyson).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fausto G. v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fausto Medina Guity
Represented By: Stephen P. Maguire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Represented By: Nicole J. Sonia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?