Kinoian v. Honeywell International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Cheryl A. Kinoian
Defendant: Honeywell Safety Products USA, Inc. and Honeywell International, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00037
Filed: January 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: Mary S McElroy
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer due 4/9/2021. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 3/19/2021. (Simoncelli, Michael)
March 12, 2021 Filing 10 Third MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer Or Otherwise Respond to The Complaint filed by Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell Safety Products USA, Inc.. Responses due by 3/26/2021. (DeLuca, Francesco)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Honeywell International, Inc. answer due 3/11/2021; Honeywell Safety Products USA, Inc. answer due 3/11/2021 - So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 3/8/2021. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
February 25, 2021 Filing 9 Second MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint filed by Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell Safety Products USA, Inc.. Responses due by 3/11/2021. (DeLuca, Francesco)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Honeywell International, Inc. answer due 2/25/2021; Honeywell Safety Products USA, Inc. answer due 2/25/2021 - So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 2/16/2021. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
February 9, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Honeywell Safety Products USA, Inc.. (DeLuca, Francesco)
February 9, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Honeywell International, Inc.. (DeLuca, Francesco)
February 9, 2021 Filing 6 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer Or Otherwise Respond To The Complaint filed by Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell Safety Products USA, Inc.. Responses due by 2/23/2021. (DeLuca, Francesco)
January 26, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cheryl A. Kinoian. Honeywell Safety Products USA, Inc. served on 1/21/2021, answer due 2/11/2021. (Sinapi, Richard)
January 26, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cheryl A. Kinoian. Honeywell International, Inc. served on 1/21/2021, answer due 2/11/2021. (Sinapi, Richard)
January 19, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell Safety Products USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Hicks, Alyson)
January 19, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell Safety Products USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Hicks, Alyson)
January 19, 2021 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
January 19, 2021 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
January 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number 0103-1585393 ), filed by Cheryl A. Kinoian. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Honeywell Int'l, #3 Summons - Honeywell Safety)(Sinapi, Richard)
January 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number 0103-1585393 ), filed by Cheryl A. Kinoian. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Honeywell Int'l, #3 Summons - Honeywell Safety)(Sinapi, Richard)
January 19, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hicks, Alyson)
January 19, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hicks, Alyson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kinoian v. Honeywell International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl A. Kinoian
Represented By: Richard A. Sinapi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell Safety Products USA, Inc.
Represented By: Francesco A. DeLuca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Represented By: Francesco A. DeLuca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?