McKee v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Pamela M McKee
Defendant: C R Bard, Inc. and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2021cv00091
Filed: February 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion to Stay to 6/30/21- So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 3/29/2021. (Barletta, Barbara)
March 26, 2021 Filing 8 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery and All Pretrial Deadlines with Proposed Order filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard, Inc.. Responses due by 4/9/2021. (Uiterwyk, Patrick)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Richard B North, Jr terminated- So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 3/5/2021. (Barletta, Barbara)
March 4, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney -Richard B. North- filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard, Inc.. Responses due by 3/18/2021. (Uiterwyk, Patrick)
March 4, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick T. Uiterwyk on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard, Inc. (Uiterwyk, Patrick)
February 25, 2021 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-00175. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Pursuant to LR Gen 201(b)(5), counsel who is a member in good standing of the bar of another federal district court is exempt from the requirements of bar membership, and may appear and practice in this Court for this case. Counsel is directed to register as an ECF Filing User in accordance with LR Gen 304(a) by completing the ECF Registration Form located under the CM/ECF Quick Link from our website. #http://www.rid.uscourts.gov
February 25, 2021 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-00175. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Pursuant to LR Gen 201(b)(5), counsel who is a member in good standing of the bar of another federal district court is exempt from the requirements of bar membership, and may appear and practice in this Court for this case. Counsel is directed to register as an ECF Filing User in accordance with LR Gen 304(a) by completing the ECF Registration Form located under the CM/ECF Quick Link from our website. #http://www.rid.uscourts.gov
February 25, 2021 Remark: Transferring Case to the District of Rhode Island via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
February 25, 2021 Remark: Transferring Case to the District of Rhode Island via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/11/2021. (MAP)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 *AMENDED By Doc. #4 *SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/9/2021. (MAP) *Modified on 2/18/2021 (MAP).
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-175-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16396055 filed by Pamela M McKee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKee v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard, Inc.
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Patrick T. Uiterwyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Patrick T. Uiterwyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela M McKee
Represented By: Arati C Furness
Represented By: Matthew Ryan McCarley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?