Ramin v. Brown University
Plaintiff: Krissy Ramin
Defendant: Brown University
Case Number: 1:2021cv00095
Filed: February 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: Mary S McElroy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2021 Filing 8 RULE 16 STATEMENT by Krissy Ramin. (Hoopis, Harry)
April 15, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing:Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for 4/30/2021 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Mary S. McElroy. Dial-in information provided to counsel by email. (Simoncelli, Michael)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: The Plaintiff's 'Motion to Seal the Records' #6 is DENIED without prejudice. Any party seeking to file a document or documents under seal must demonstrate that 'good cause' exists to do so. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(c). Plaintiff is directed to confer with opposing counsel and narrowly tailor any future requests prior to filing any motions to seal records. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 4/15/2021. (Simoncelli, Michael)
April 13, 2021 Filing 6 First MOTION to Seal Records Filed. Notice Sent To: Krissy Ramin, Brown University. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Ramin Affidavit)(Hoopis, Harry) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
March 5, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Brown University. (Baldwin, Timothy)
March 5, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Brown University.(Baldwin, Timothy)
March 3, 2021 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Hicks, Alyson)
March 1, 2021 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
February 27, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
February 27, 2021 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2021-00407. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0103-1598124, filed by Brown University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Baldwin, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramin v. Brown University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krissy Ramin
Represented By: Harry J. Hoopis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown University
Represented By: Timothy K. Baldwin
Represented By: Michael D. Grabo
Represented By: Joseph D. Whelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?