Ross v. Cox Rhode Island Telecom, LLC
Plaintiff: Carolyn D Ross
Defendant: CoxCom, LLC, d/b/a Cox Communications New England, Cox Rhode Island Telecom, LLC, d/b/a Cox Communications, CoxCom, LLC doing business as Cox Communications New England and Cox Rhode Island Telecom, LLC doing business as Cox Communications
Case Number: 1:2021cv00118
Filed: March 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 621
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.: Telephone Conference held on 9/21/2021; counsel on call: C. Davis, R. Sinapi; E. Mack. (Jackson, Ryan)
September 20, 2021 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference scheduled for TUESDAY 9/21/2021 at 10:00 AM before Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.; Dial-in instructions will be emailed to all counsel. (Jackson, Ryan)
July 21, 2021 HEARING CANCELLED: The telephonic rule 16 conference scheduled for Tuesday, 7/27/21 at 9:00 a.m. is cancelled (Barletta, Barbara)
July 21, 2021 REVISED NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference is RESCHEDULED to Tuesday, 7/27/2021 at 09:00 AM before Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. Dial in instructions will be emailed to counsel of record prior to the conference (Barletta, Barbara)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT SCHEDULING ORDER: Factual Discovery to close by 1/21/2022; Plaintiff's Expert Disclosures shall be made by 2/22/2022; Defendant's Expert Disclosures shall be made by 3/24/2022; Expert Discovery to close by 4/25/2022 and Dispositive Motions shall be filed by 5/23/2022 - So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 7/21/2021. (Barletta, Barbara)
July 15, 2021 Filing 12 RULE 16 STATEMENT by All Defendants. (Mack, Eric)
July 15, 2021 Filing 11 RULE 16 STATEMENT by Carolyn D Ross. (Sinapi, Richard)
June 23, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for Thursday, 7/22/2021 at 09:00 AM before Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.; Call in instructions will be emailed to counsel of record prior to the conference (Barletta, Barbara)
June 23, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for Thursday, 7/22/2021 at 09:00 AM before Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.; Call in instructions will be emailed to counsel of record prior to the conference (Barletta, Barbara)
June 7, 2021 Filing 9 DEFENDANTS' ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by Cox Rhode Island Telecom, LLC, CoxCom, LLC.(Mack, Eric)
June 7, 2021 Filing 9 DEFENDANTS' ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by Cox Rhode Island Telecom, LLC, CoxCom, LLC.(Mack, Eric)
April 29, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carolyn D Ross. CoxCom, LLC served on 4/15/2021, answer due 6/7/2021. (Sinapi, Richard)
April 29, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carolyn D Ross. CoxCom, LLC served on 4/15/2021, answer due 6/7/2021. (Sinapi, Richard)
April 29, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carolyn D Ross. Cox Rhode Island Telecom, LLC served on 4/15/2021, answer due 6/7/2021. (Sinapi, Richard)
April 29, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carolyn D Ross. Cox Rhode Island Telecom, LLC served on 4/15/2021, answer due 6/7/2021. (Sinapi, Richard)
April 27, 2021 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Carolyn D Ross.(Sinapi, Richard)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to answer or file responsive pleading; Reset Deadlines: Cox Rhode Island Telecom, LLC answer due 6/7/2021; CoxCom, LLC answer due 6/7/2021. - So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 4/27/2021. (Barletta, Barbara)
April 26, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for an Extension of Time To Extend The Deadline To Respond To Complaint filed by Cox Rhode Island Telecom, LLC, CoxCom, LLC. Responses due by 5/10/2021. (Mack, Eric)
April 23, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric B. Mack on behalf of Cox Rhode Island Telecom, LLC, CoxCom, LLC (Mack, Eric)
March 10, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Cox Rhode Island Telecom, LLC, CoxCom, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Hicks, Alyson)
March 10, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Cox Rhode Island Telecom, LLC, CoxCom, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Hicks, Alyson)
March 10, 2021 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
March 10, 2021 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
March 10, 2021 Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hicks, Alyson)
March 10, 2021 Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hicks, Alyson)
March 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number 0103-1601194 ), filed by Carolyn D Ross. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Cox RI Telecom, #3 Summons - CoxCom)(Sinapi, Richard)
March 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number 0103-1601194 ), filed by Carolyn D Ross. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Cox RI Telecom, #3 Summons - CoxCom)(Sinapi, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ross v. Cox Rhode Island Telecom, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn D Ross
Represented By: Richard A. Sinapi
Represented By: Chloe A. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CoxCom, LLC, d/b/a Cox Communications New England
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cox Rhode Island Telecom, LLC, d/b/a Cox Communications
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CoxCom, LLC doing business as Cox Communications New England
Represented By: Eric B. Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cox Rhode Island Telecom, LLC doing business as Cox Communications
Represented By: Eric B. Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?