Smith v. Prudential Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Brian Smith
Defendant: Prudential Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 1:2021cv00121
Filed: March 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: Mary S McElroy
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 704
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Brian Smith. Responses due by 5/24/2021. (Lieberman, George)
May 3, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Prudential Insurance Company of America. Responses due by 5/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A - AICPA's Insurance Trust Long Term Disability Coverage, #3 Exhibit B - Final Order of Revocation, #4 Exhibit C - AICPA's Bylaw Section 730R, #5 Exhibit D - Dr. Tremont's Report, #6 Exhibit E - AICPA's Group Contract)(Jusczyk, Michael) Modified on 5/4/2021 (McGuire, Vickie).CLERKS NOTE: Remote electronic access to the document has been restricted by the Clerks Office as it contains one or more personal identifiers.
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Prudential Insurance Company of America answer due 5/3/2021. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 4/2/2021. (Simoncelli, Michael) Modified on 4/5/2021 to correct answer due date. The answer due date should have read 5/3/21 (Simoncelli, Michael).
March 31, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Prudential Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent Prudential Financial, Inc. for Prudential Insurance Company of America.. (Jusczyk, Michael)
March 31, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Prudential Insurance Company of America. Responses due by 4/14/2021. (Jusczyk, Michael)
March 29, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Brian Smith. Amendment to #1 Complaint . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Lieberman, George)
March 22, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Smith. Prudential Insurance Company of America served on 3/15/2021, answer due 4/5/2021. (Lieberman, George)
March 12, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Simoncelli, Michael)
March 12, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Simoncelli, Michael)
March 12, 2021 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Simoncelli, Michael)
March 12, 2021 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Simoncelli, Michael)
March 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number 0103-1602019 ), filed by Brian Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 SUMMONS)(Lieberman, George)
March 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number 0103-1602019 ), filed by Brian Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 SUMMONS)(Lieberman, George)
March 12, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Simoncelli, Michael)
March 12, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Simoncelli, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Prudential Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Michael E. Jusczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Smith
Represented By: George E. Lieberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?