Merrimack Mutual Fire Insurance Company v. Johnny's Oil & Heating, Inc.
Plaintiff: Merrimack Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Defendant: Johnny's Oil & Heating, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00127
Filed: March 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Johnny's Oil & Heating, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Entry of Appearance)(Clarkin, Peter)
April 26, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by Merrimack Mutual Fire Insurance Company for Summons in a Civil Action Johnny's Oil & Heating, Inc. served on 4/17/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (Warren, Shannon) Service date corrected on 4/26/2021 (Hicks, Alyson).
March 18, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Johnny's Oil & Heating, Inc. (Hicks, Alyson)
March 18, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Request filed by Merrimack Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Warren, Shannon)
March 17, 2021 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
March 17, 2021 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
March 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number 0103-1603559 ), filed by Merrimack Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Warren, Shannon)
March 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number 0103-1603559 ), filed by Merrimack Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Warren, Shannon)
March 17, 2021 Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Hicks, Alyson)
March 17, 2021 Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Hicks, Alyson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Merrimack Mutual Fire Insurance Company v. Johnny's Oil & Heating, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merrimack Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Shannon M. Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnny's Oil & Heating, Inc.
Represented By: Peter A Clarkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?