Hero v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Anita Hero
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 1:2021cv00130
Filed: March 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2021 Filing 8 Joint MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR FILING A RESPONSIVE PLEADING filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. Responses due by 5/19/2021. (Guilfoyle, Kathleen)
April 9, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Guilfoyle, Kathleen)
April 9, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen M. Guilfoyle on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Guilfoyle, Kathleen)
April 6, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Anita Hero. (Gemma, Mark)
April 6, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Anita Hero. (Gemma, Mark)
April 2, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Charles G. Orr to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1610189 ) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Court Admissions List, #2 Exhibit Cert of Good Standing)(Gemma, Mark)
March 19, 2021 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
March 19, 2021 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
March 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number 0103-1604398 ), filed by Anita Hero. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gemma, Mark)
March 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number 0103-1604398 ), filed by Anita Hero. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gemma, Mark)
March 19, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
March 19, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hero v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc.
Represented By: Kathleen M. Guilfoyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Kathleen M. Guilfoyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita Hero
Represented By: Mark W. Gemma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?