United States v. Martins et al
Plaintiff: United States
Defendant: Juliana Martins
Garnishee: Bank of America
Case Number: 1:2021cv00134
Filed: March 19, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Mary S McElroy
2 Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 3001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #10 MOTION to Quash Subpoena, #9 MOTION to Quash Subpoena referred for determination to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Simoncelli, Michael)
May 11, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Quash Subpoena. Responses due by 5/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie)
May 11, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Quash Subpoena. Responses due by 5/25/2021. (Potter, Carrie)
May 4, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment filed on Behalf of Bank of America by United States. Objections to Writ Answer due by 5/24/2021. (Rogers, Mary)
May 4, 2021 NOTICE of VIDEO Hearing on Motion #5 MOTION for Hearing re #3 Writ of Garnishment : VIDEO Motion Hearing set for 6/7/2021 at 10:00 AM in Remote Hearing before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan.(Zoom Meeting ID: 161 862 8395, Passcode: 484877) (Leyva, Lucia)
May 4, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan: VIDEO Pre-Hearing Conference held on 5/4/2021. Government: Mary Rogers; Defendant: Juliana Martins pro se. Court sets Defendant's Motion for a Hearing re #3 Writ of Garnishment down for 6/7/21 at 10:00 a.m. (Leyva, Lucia)
April 15, 2021 NOTICE of Hearing: VIDEO PRE-HEARING CONFERENCE set for 5/4/2021 at 10:00 AM in Remote Hearing before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan.(Zoom Meeting ID: 160 050 7236, Passcode: 532377) (Saucier, Martha)
April 15, 2021 HEARING CANCELLED re Pre- Hearing Video Conference set for 4/23/2021 at 11:30 AM in Remote Hearing before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan has been cancelled. Court to reschedule. (Saucier, Martha)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion to Continue Pre-Hearing Conference scheduled for 4/23/2021. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 4/15/2021. (Saucier, Martha)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL entered. Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy for all further proceedings- So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 4/13/2021. (Barletta, Barbara)
April 13, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Continue filed by United States. Responses due by 4/27/2021. (Rogers, Mary)
April 13, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #6 MOTION to Continue referred for determination to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Barletta, Barbara)
April 8, 2021 NOTICE of Hearing: Pre- Hearing Video Conference set for 4/23/2021 at 11:30 AM in Remote Hearing before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan.(Zoom Meeting ID: 160 050 7236, Passcode: 532377) (Saucier, Martha)
April 6, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #5 MOTION for Hearing re #3 Writ of Garnishment referred for determination to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Barletta, Barbara)
April 5, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Hearing re #3 Writ of Garnishment filed by Juliana Martins. Responses due by 4/19/2021. (Barletta, Barbara)
March 29, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States re #3 Writ of Garnishment (Rogers, Mary)
March 22, 2021 Filing 3 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued (Barletta, Barbara)
March 22, 2021 Filing 2 Clerk's Notice of Post-Judgment Garnishment & Instructions to the Defendant. (Barletta, Barbara)
March 22, 2021 CASE PERMANENTLY ASSIGNED Since Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. has determined that this case is in fact related to CR 14-34-JJM, this case is permanently assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. for all further proceedings (Barletta, Barbara)
March 19, 2021 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment , filed by United States. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Copy of Judgment, #3 Governments Notice and Instructions, #4 Proposed Writ of Garnishment, #5 Proposed Clerk's Notice and Instructions, #6 Request for hearing Form, #7 Notice and Instructions regarding exemptions, #8 Proposed Garnishee Answer Form, #9 Instructions to Garnishee)(Rogers, Mary)
March 19, 2021 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment , filed by United States. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Copy of Judgment, #3 Governments Notice and Instructions, #4 Proposed Writ of Garnishment, #5 Proposed Clerk's Notice and Instructions, #6 Request for hearing Form, #7 Notice and Instructions regarding exemptions, #8 Proposed Garnishee Answer Form, #9 Instructions to Garnishee)(Rogers, Mary)
March 19, 2021 CASE CONDITIONALLY ASSIGNED to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. Related Case Number CR14-34-JJM-PAS based upon the indication on the cover sheet that a related case previously was assigned to the presiding judge. The assignment is subject to the presiding judge's determination that the cases, in fact, are related. (Potter, Carrie)
March 19, 2021 CASE CONDITIONALLY ASSIGNED to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. Related Case Number CR14-34-JJM-PAS based upon the indication on the cover sheet that a related case previously was assigned to the presiding judge. The assignment is subject to the presiding judge's determination that the cases, in fact, are related. (Potter, Carrie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States v. Martins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Bank of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States
Represented By: Mary Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juliana Martins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?